Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 225 Today
» 1220 Yesterday
» 225 Week
» 27699 Month
» 324713 Year
» 401300 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5901 22/05/1959

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams 22/05/1959
Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting 29/04/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 23
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 22/05/1959
Withdrawn 07/12/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 22/05/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
   w/e 06/09/1969
   Withdrawn 07/12/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/05/1959 To Service To service as D5901
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
Livery applied: Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
29/04/1965 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting    
06/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Research Department (Derby) (92D)    
07/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5901    
01/02/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev