Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 309 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3771 Week
» 23504 Month
» 320518 Year
» 397105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5902 01/05/1959

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams 01/05/1959
Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting 27/11/1964

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 23
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 01/05/1959
Withdrawn 23/11/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1970
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 01/05/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
   Withdrawn 23/11/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/05/1959 To Service To service as D5902
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
Livery applied: Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
27/11/1964 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
23/11/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5902    
01/08/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev