Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 314 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3776 Week
» 23509 Month
» 320523 Year
» 397110 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5903 17/04/1959

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams 17/04/1959
Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting 04/09/1964
Brunswick green with full yellow ends and light green skirting 03/1967

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 23
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 17/04/1959
Withdrawn 30/12/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 17/04/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
   Withdrawn 30/12/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1959 To Service To service as D5903
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
Livery applied: Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
04/09/1964 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting    
03/1967 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with full yellow ends and light green skirting    
30/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5903    
01/06/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
01/09/1969 Sightings At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO489 11/69 Link

prev prev