Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4376 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17782 Week
» 70798 Month
» 190325 Year
» 3217178 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5904 |
24/04/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams |
24/04/1959 |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
01/07/1964 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow ends and light green skirting |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/04/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5904 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/07/1964 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow ends and light green skirting |
|
|
20/01/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5904 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|