Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 222 Today
» 1220 Yesterday
» 222 Week
» 27696 Month
» 324710 Year
» 401297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5906 08/05/1959

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams 08/05/1959
Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting 29/10/1964
Brunswick green with full yellow ends and light green skirting 1968

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 23
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 08/05/1959
Withdrawn 30/09/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 07/1971
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 08/05/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
   Withdrawn 30/09/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/05/1959 To Service To service as D5906
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
Livery applied: Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
18/03/1961 Sightings 10:30 Kings Cross - Cambridge - Green with light grey skirts and red panel and buffer beam The Early Years of London Diesels  
29/10/1964 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting    
1968 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with full yellow ends and light green skirting    
30/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5906    
07/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev