Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 898 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 898 Week
» 23879 Month
» 387124 Year
» 463711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5907 15/05/1959

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams 15/05/1959
Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting 31/03/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 23
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 15/05/1959
Withdrawn 20/10/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 15/05/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
   Withdrawn 20/10/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/05/1959 To Service To service as D5907
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
Livery applied: Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
31/03/1965 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting    
01/06/1967 Sightings Arriving at Kings Cross with an ecs - Two tone green with yellow warning panel The Early Years of London Diesels  
20/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D5907    
01/07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev