Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 312 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3774 Week
» 23507 Month
» 320521 Year
» 397108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5908 29/05/1959

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams 29/05/1959
Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting 18/08/1964
Brunswick green with full yellow ends and light green skirting 11/1967

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 23
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 29/05/1959
Withdrawn 09/03/1969
Time in Service 9 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 02/1970
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 29/05/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
   Withdrawn 09/03/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/05/1959 To Service To service as D5908
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
Livery applied: Brunswick Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
18/08/1964 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick Green with half yellow panels and light green skirting    
11/1967 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with full yellow ends and light green skirting    
09/03/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5908    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
02/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev