Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 821 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5395 Week
» 33353 Month
» 67995 Year
» 1289560 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5918 m/e 07/1931

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1931 WALTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1931
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 31/12/1950
81E Didcot 4w/e 31/10/1959
81F Oxford 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 5918, name: WALTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5918    

prev prev