Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 477 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6231 Week
» 34189 Month
» 68831 Year
» 1290396 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5923 m/e 05/1933

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1933 COLSTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1933
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Scrapping During 05/1964
Service Life 30 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84D Leamington 4w/e 28/02/1951
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 19/05/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/08/1954
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 22/03/1958
81F Oxford 4w/e 04/11/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84D Leamington m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1933 To Service To service as GWR Number 5923, name: COLSTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5923    

prev prev