Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 505 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2620 Week
» 25126 Month
» 328316 Year
» 1549881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5929 on 12/06/1933

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/06/1933 HANHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 281
To Service Mon 12/06/1933
Withdrawal Mon 28/10/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 12/06/1933
LDR Landore 4w/e 30/10/1948
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/03/1951
87E Landore 3w/e 19/05/1951
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 01/11/1958
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
82D Westbury 4w/e 14/07/1962
81C Southall 2w/e 17/11/1962
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 28/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 2w/e 17/11/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/06/1933 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5929, name: HANHAM HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
28/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5929    

prev prev