Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 786 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5360 Week
» 33318 Month
» 67960 Year
» 1289525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5933 m/e 06/1933

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1933 KINGSWY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1933
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965
Service Life 32 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 22/02/1958
81F Oxford 4w/e 27/02/1960
84C Banbury 4w/e 21/05/1960
81F Oxford 4w/e 03/12/1960
81F Oxford 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 81F Oxford 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1933 To Service To service as GWR Number 5933, name: KINGSWY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5933    

prev prev