Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 537 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2652 Week
» 25158 Month
» 328348 Year
» 1549913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5945 on 21/03/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/03/1935 LECKHAMPTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 290
To Service Mon 21/03/1935
Withdrawal Mon 08/04/1963
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 28 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 21/03/1935
84C Banbury 4w/e 17/07/1954
84B Oxley 4w/e 09/10/1954
81F Oxford 4w/e 21/05/1955
83D Laira m/e 16/06/1956
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/10/1956
82D Westbury 4w/e 04/10/1958
82C Swindon 4w/e 11/07/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 25/03/1961
81F Oxford 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn on 08/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/10/1956
EXLOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR P 30/09/1958
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 25/03/1961
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1935 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5945, name: LECKHAMPTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
08/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5945    

prev prev