Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 4337 Month
» 312318 Year
» 1196699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5950 m/e 04/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1935 WARDLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1935
Withdrawal During 11/1961
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury 4w/e 04/10/1952
82D Westbury 4w/e 21/05/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/10/1955
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 11/07/1959
82D Westbury 4w/e 20/05/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   m/e 30/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 5950, name: WARDLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 5950    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962 Link

prev prev