Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 403 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2849 Week
» 14554 Month
» 346043 Year
» 422630 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5952   12/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1935 COGAN HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1935
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 28 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 31/10/1950
83G Penzance 4w/e 01/01/1955
83D Laira 4w/e 16/07/1955
85A Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1955
85C Hereford 4w/e 05/09/1959
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 5952, name: COGAN HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5952    

prev prev