Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 792 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 33324 Month
» 67966 Year
» 1289531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5971 m/e 04/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1937 MEREVALE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1937
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85A Worcester 4w/e 31/12/1950
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/08/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 15/12/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/04/1963
81C Southall 7w/e 22/06/1964
81D Reading (W.R.) 6w/e 12/10/1964
81F Oxford 4w/e 27/12/1964
85A Worcester 2w/e 10/01/1965
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/08/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 81E Didcot 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 81E Didcot 3w/e 05/10/1964
ALLOC 81F Oxford 3w/e 19/12/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester 5w/e 04/01/1965
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/08/1965
ALLOC 81F Oxford 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 5971, name: MEREVALE HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
27/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
08/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5971    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev