Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 781 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6386 Week
» 17933 Month
» 417615 Year
» 494202 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5972   04/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1937 OLTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1937
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira 4w/e 31/03/1951
84B Oxley 4w/e 01/11/1952
83F Truro 4w/e 17/07/1954
83G Penzance 4w/e 08/10/1955
83D Laira 4w/e 29/11/1958
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/08/1959
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 18/06/1960
87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 15/12/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/06/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 84E Tyseley m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 15/12/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 5972, name: OLTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5972    

prev prev