|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/1938 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5981, name: FRENSHAM HALL Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) | ||
29/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
15/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) | ||
06/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (82C) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
14/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5981 | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |