Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 379 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 379 Week
» 22885 Month
» 326075 Year
» 1547640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5989 on 05/12/1939

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/12/1939 CRANSLEY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 327
To Service Fri 05/12/1939
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 05/12/1939
SHL Southall 4w/e 03/12/1949
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/07/1957
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 07/09/1957
84C Banbury 4w/e 02/11/1957
81F Oxford 4w/e 03/12/1960
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHL Southall 4w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/07/1961
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 SLS/194701
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5989, name: CRANSLEY HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (SHL)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5989    

prev prev