Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 384 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 384 Week
» 22890 Month
» 326080 Year
» 1547645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5996 on 03/06/1940

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/06/1940 MYTTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 333
To Service Mon 03/06/1940
Withdrawal Mon 27/08/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 03/06/1940
81C Southall 8w/e 20/04/1957
85A Worcester 4w/e 28/11/1959
84B Oxley 4w/e 15/07/1961
85A Worcester 4w/e 04/11/1961
84B Oxley 4w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn on 27/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 15/07/1961
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1943 Sheds noted 1/43 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/06/1940 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5996, name: MYTTON HALL
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
27/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5996    

prev prev