Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1339 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19142 Week
» 72158 Month
» 191685 Year
» 3218538 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D60 |
15/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45022 |
11/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97409 |
09/1987 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
15/02/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
07/1988 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/02/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/04/1964 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
16/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
03/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D60 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Naming |
Named 'LYTHAM ST. ANNES' |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45022 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
09/1987 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
09/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97409 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97409 |
|
|
10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|