|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 14/01/1958 | n/a | 16/01/1958 | 24/01/1958 | Adjustment ATC gear repairs |
9 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 02/04/1958 | 68 days | 08/04/1958 | 17/04/1958 | Unclassified | 10 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 23/06/1958 | 67 days | 23/06/1958 | 23/06/1958 | Adjustment Modifications |
1 day | ||||||
Swindon Works | 01/04/1959 | 282 days | 03/04/1959 | 03/07/1959 | Light Casual 100,000 mile overhaul |
92 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 19/12/1959 | 169 days | 19/12/1959 | 22/12/1959 | Light Casual | 4 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 11/04/1960 | 111 days | 13/04/1960 | 12/05/1960 | Light Casual | 30 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 07/08/1960 | 87 days | 07/08/1960 | 16/11/1960 | Light Casual | 102 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 23/12/1960 | 37 days | 24/12/1960 | 06/01/1961 | Unclassified | 14 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 11/01/1961 | 5 days | 11/01/1961 | 17/02/1961 | Light Casual | 38 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 16/03/1961 | 27 days | 16/03/1961 | 23/03/1961 | Light Casual | 8 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 28/11/1961 | 250 days | 28/11/1961 | 14/12/1961 | Light Casual | 17 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 29/01/1962 | 46 days | 29/01/1962 | 31/01/1962 | Light Casual | 3 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 02/02/1962 | 2 days | 13/02/1962 | 10/05/1962 | Heavy Casual Repaint |
87 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 29/06/1962 | 50 days | 29/06/1962 | 29/06/1962 | Heavy Casual | 1 day | ||||||
Swindon Works | 18/09/1962 | 81 days | 24/09/1962 | 01/11/1962 | Heavy Casual | 39 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 06/10/1963 | 339 days | 06/10/1963 | 12/10/1963 | Light Casual | 7 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 28/07/1964 | 290 days | 28/07/1964 | 12/08/1964 | Special Component change |
16 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | n/a | 04/12/1966 | Unknown Regime Seen in ‘A’ shop on this date |
|||||||||
Swindon Works | n/a | 07/05/1967 | Unknown Regime Seen in weigh shop on this date in blue livery |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Adjustment) - Arr: 16/01/1958. Dep: 24/01/1958. Stopped on 14/01/1958 Work undertaken: ATC gear repairs |
||
24/01/1958 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D600, name: ACTIVE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27660 Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
||
08/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 17/04/1958. Stopped on 02/04/1958 |
||
17/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
23/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Adjustment) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 23/06/1958. Stopped on 23/06/1958 Work undertaken: Modifications |
||
03/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. Stopped on 01/04/1959 Work undertaken: 100,000 mile overhaul |
||
19/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1959. Dep: 22/12/1959. Stopped on 19/12/1959 |
||
13/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 12/05/1960. Stopped on 11/04/1960 |
||
07/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1960. Dep: 16/11/1960. Stopped on 07/08/1960 |
||
24/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. Stopped on 23/12/1960 |
||
11/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1961. Dep: 17/02/1961. Stopped on 11/01/1961 |
||
16/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1961. Dep: 23/03/1961. Stopped on 16/03/1961 |
||
28/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1961. Dep: 14/12/1961. Stopped on 28/11/1961 |
||
29/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 31/01/1962. Stopped on 29/01/1962 |
||
13/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1962. Dep: 10/05/1962. Stopped on 02/02/1962 Work undertaken: Repaint |
||
29/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1962. Dep: 29/06/1962. Stopped on 29/06/1962 |
||
24/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1962. Dep: 01/11/1962. Stopped on 18/09/1962 |
||
06/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1963. Dep: 12/10/1963. Stopped on 06/10/1963 |
||
28/07/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Special) - Arr: 28/07/1964. Dep: 12/08/1964. Stopped on 28/07/1964 Work undertaken: Component change |
||
04/12/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 04/12/1966. Work undertaken: Seen in ‘A’ shop on this date |
||
07/05/1967 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 07/05/1967. Work undertaken: Seen in weigh shop on this date in blue livery |
||
31/12/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 600 | ||
03/1970 | Scrapped | Broken up by Woodham Brothers: Barry, South Glamorgan |