Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1217   05/1905
LNER (1924) 8217 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5567 y/e 04/1946
BR 65567 y/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Holden
Class J17
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G58
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal Mon 06/08/1962
Service Life 57 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys
Information Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MC Melton Constable 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32G Melton Constable 5w/e 22/10/1955
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 15/11/1958
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/09/1960
31B March w/e 07/04/1962
   Withdrawn 06/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MC Melton Constable 12/03/1947
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 28/04/1962
WDN   06/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1923 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1923 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as GER Number 1217
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1923 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
09/1923 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8217    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5567    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65567    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65567    

prev prev