|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1948 | 17/11/1948 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1950 | 06/07/1950 | 52 days | General | Named BOIS ROUSSEL |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1950 | 03/11/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1951 | 20/11/1951 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1953 | 11/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1953 | 06/05/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29839 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1953 | 24/11/1953 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1954 | 11/10/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1956 | 11/05/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1956 | 21/11/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29879 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1957 | 27/09/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1958 | 02/04/1958 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1958 | 07/01/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 10597 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1960 | 16/11/1960 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1963 | 22/05/1963 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Crimpsall) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60117 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2034 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1948. Dep: 17/11/1948. | ||
16/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1950. Dep: 06/07/1950. Work undertaken: Named BOIS ROUSSEL |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
06/07/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
30/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1950. Dep: 03/11/1950. | ||
15/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951. | ||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953. Work undertaken: ATC fitted |
||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 06/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29839 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1953. Dep: 24/11/1953. | ||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 11/10/1954. | ||
20/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. | ||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956. | ||
17/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1956. Dep: 21/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29879 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1957. Dep: 27/09/1957. | ||
15/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1958. Dep: 02/04/1958. | ||
25/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1958. Dep: 07/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10597 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1960. Dep: 16/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1963. Dep: 22/05/1963. | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
06/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60117 from Ardsley (56B) |