|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1948 | 13/01/1949 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1949 | 09/03/1949 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1950 | 20/07/1950 | 50 days | General | Named KESTREL |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1950 | 12/12/1950 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1951 | 10/04/1951 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1951 | 11/01/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1952 | 10/03/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1952 | 16/10/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1953 | 11/02/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1953 | 02/03/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1954 | 11/03/1954 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1954 | 18/05/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1954 | 23/12/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1955 | 24/01/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | ATC gear re-fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1955 | 26/04/1955 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1956 | 13/02/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1956 | 29/11/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29859 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1957 | 06/08/1957 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1958 | 29/07/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1959 | 27/11/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1960 | 16/07/1960 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29805 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1962 | 13/02/1963 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/09/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60130 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2049 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
17/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
23/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
30/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1948. Dep: 13/01/1949. | ||
01/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1949. Dep: 09/03/1949. | ||
01/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1950. Dep: 20/07/1950. Work undertaken: Named KESTREL |
||
20/07/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
17/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1950. Dep: 12/12/1950. | ||
03/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1951. Dep: 10/04/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
05/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 11/01/1952. | ||
10/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/03/1952. Dep: 10/03/1952. | ||
14/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1952. Dep: 16/10/1952. Work undertaken: ATC fitted |
||
14/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1953. Dep: 02/03/1953. | ||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 11/03/1954. | ||
27/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1954. Dep: 18/05/1954. | ||
22/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1954. Dep: 23/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 24/01/1955. Work undertaken: ATC gear re-fitted |
||
26/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955. | ||
13/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/02/1956. Dep: 13/02/1956. | ||
30/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1956. Dep: 29/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29859 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. | ||
27/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1957. Dep: 06/08/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
25/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. | ||
14/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1958. Dep: 29/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1959. Dep: 27/11/1959. | ||
25/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1960. Dep: 16/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29805 (Diagram 118) |
||
31/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1962. Dep: 13/02/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60130 from Ardsley (56B) |