|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/08/1949 | 16/08/1949 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1949 | 19/10/1949 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1949 | 10/11/1949 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1950 | 01/02/1950 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1950 | 15/09/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) Named SIR WALTER SCOTT |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1951 | 18/10/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1953 | 25/02/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1955 | 16/11/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/02/1957 | 26/02/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1957 | 20/07/1957 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 10597 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1958 | 19/03/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1958 | 02/09/1958 | 23 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1959 | 15/07/1959 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1961 | 19/05/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29850 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/02/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60143 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2062 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/08/1949. Dep: 16/08/1949. | ||
03/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949. | ||
10/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/11/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949. | ||
16/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1950. Dep: 01/02/1950. | ||
10/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 15/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) Named SIR WALTER SCOTT |
||
15/09/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
18/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1951. Dep: 18/10/1951. | ||
18/10/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 25/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
10/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1955. Dep: 16/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1957. Dep: 26/02/1957. | ||
16/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1957. Dep: 20/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10597 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1958. Dep: 19/03/1958. | ||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 02/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
05/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1959. Dep: 15/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
10/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29850 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
06/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60143 from York (North) (50A) |