|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/04/1949 | 28/04/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1950 | 15/12/1950 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named PEREGRINE |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1951 | 04/12/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29859 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1952 | 27/05/1952 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1953 | 13/03/1953 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1954 | 06/01/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29805 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1955 | 19/01/1955 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1955 | 15/02/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1955 | 17/06/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1956 | 05/06/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1956 | 28/12/1956 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1957 | 14/03/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1957 | 10/05/1957 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1957 | 31/05/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1958 | 21/10/1958 | 20 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29872 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1959 | 23/07/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29868 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1960 | 08/07/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1960 | 07/10/1960 | 54 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1961 | 23/11/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1962 | 24/05/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1964 | 14/03/1964 | 44 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
31/12/1950 | Newly-named \"Al\"\'s | Newly named 'A1''s are Nos. 60132 Marmion and 60146 Peregrine. | SLS/195102 |
01/02/1964 | Branch line news (Erecting Shop) | Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60146 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2065 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
25/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1949. Dep: 28/04/1949. | ||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950. Work undertaken: Named PEREGRINE |
||
01/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1951. Dep: 04/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29859 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 27/05/1952. | ||
06/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 13/03/1953. | ||
29/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 06/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29805 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 19/01/1955. | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 15/02/1955. | ||
17/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/06/1955. Dep: 17/06/1955. | ||
05/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/06/1956. Dep: 05/06/1956. | ||
17/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 28/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 14/03/1957. | ||
27/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1957. Dep: 10/05/1957. | ||
24/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957. | ||
08/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. | ||
11/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. | ||
02/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29872 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1959. Dep: 23/07/1959. | ||
30/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29868 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1960. Dep: 08/07/1960. | ||
15/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1960. Dep: 07/10/1960. | ||
20/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1961. Dep: 23/11/1961. | ||
16/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1962. Dep: 24/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
13/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
31/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1964. Dep: 14/03/1964. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60146 from York (North) (50A) |