|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 12/07/1949 | 15/07/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/05/1950 | 08/05/1950 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/06/1950 | 26/06/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1951 | 02/03/1951 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) Named MIDLOTHIAN |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1952 | 11/06/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1953 | 04/09/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1955 | 05/05/1955 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1956 | 15/08/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1958 | 06/02/1958 | 31 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1958 | 22/05/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1960 | 14/09/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1961 | 21/12/1961 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 10590 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1962 | 10/01/1963 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1963 | 12/02/1963 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1963 | 11/07/1963 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1964 | 20/02/1964 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1964 | 21/04/1964 | 19 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1951 | A1 Names | 'Al' names lately affixed include: 60150 Willbrook; 60151 Midlothian (new cast chimney); 60153 Flamboyant; 60155 Borderer; 60158 Aberdonian. | SLS/195105 |
31/05/1951 | \"Heart of Midlothian\" service | A1 No. 60151 Midlothian fitted with new type double chimney worked the inaugural 'Heart of Midlothian' Festival train from King's Cross, with a complete set of new standard coaches. No. 60116, lately named Hal o'the Wynd has also acquired a similar chimney. B17 No. 61653, on the other hand, is 'recently off works with what appears to be a K3 chimney and looks rather odd: it is appearing regularly at the moment on the 'Royal' working, No. 61671 being a casualty yet again. | SLS/195107 |
07/09/1955 | Royal Train | On 7th Sept. the Royal Train conveying Her Majesty from Ballater to Bawtry, Doncaster, was worked from Edinburgh (Waverley) to Doncaster and back by Class A4 60024. A standby engine for Berwick was provided by Greensfield Shed, Gateshead Class Al 60151 being worked light engine to Tweedmouth on the 6th Sept. | SLS/195512 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Boiler Park) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60151 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2070 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
12/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 15/07/1949. | ||
03/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 08/05/1950. | ||
22/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1950. Dep: 26/06/1950. | ||
15/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1951. Dep: 02/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) Named MIDLOTHIAN |
||
07/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1952. Dep: 11/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/06/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
07/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1953. Dep: 04/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1955. Dep: 05/05/1955. | ||
13/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1956. Dep: 15/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29832 (Diagram 118) |
||
07/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1958. Dep: 06/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
13/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958. | ||
24/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
02/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1960. Dep: 14/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
22/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1961. Dep: 21/12/1961. | ||
29/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10590 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
20/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1962. Dep: 10/01/1963. | ||
05/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1963. Dep: 12/02/1963. | ||
20/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1963. Dep: 11/07/1963. | ||
05/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1964. Dep: 20/02/1964. | ||
03/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1964. Dep: 21/04/1964. | ||
18/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
24/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60151 from York (North) (50A) |