|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1949 | 06/01/1950 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1950 | 27/04/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1951 | 18/04/1951 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named BON ACCORD |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1951 | 09/05/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1952 | 15/08/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1954 | 15/11/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1955 | 26/07/1955 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1956 | 05/07/1956 | 2 days | Special | Axle test |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1957 | 27/04/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 10598 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1959 | 01/09/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1960 | 01/05/1960 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1961 | 16/11/1961 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1962 | 12/11/1962 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1963 | 29/08/1963 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1963 | 01/11/1963 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1964 | 07/11/1964 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1964 | 10/11/1964 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/07/1957 | Royal Visit To Catterick Camp | On Wednesday, 10th July, 1957, the Royal Train comprised 11 coaches and was hauled by Ll tanks 67766 an 67777 from Catterick Bridge to Catterick Camp over the military railway. Ll tank 67755 running as light engine preceded the train and stood by at Catterick Camp as reserve engine. On the return to Catterick Bridge, the train ran into a heavy downpour of rain. Gateshead Al Pacific 60154 'Bon Accord' specially polished up for the occasion and running tender first had previously arrived at Catterick Bridge station ready to back on to the Royal Train. Coupling up to the train which was drawn up on the west side of Catterick Bridge station, 60154 left at approximately 12-45 p.m. for Eryholme Junction where another main line engine waited to take the Royal Train on to Harrogate. The L1 tanks coupled up at Catterick Bridge station in the order 67777, 67766 and 67755, returned light to Darlington as did also 60154. | SLS/195709 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/09/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60154 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2048 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
19/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950. | ||
20/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1950. Dep: 27/04/1950. | ||
07/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 18/04/1951. Work undertaken: Named BON ACCORD |
||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 09/05/1951. | ||
10/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1952. Dep: 15/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/08/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
12/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 15/11/1954. | ||
07/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1955. Dep: 26/07/1955. | ||
04/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 05/07/1956. Work undertaken: Axle test |
||
22/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. | ||
21/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10598 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1959. Dep: 01/09/1959. | ||
22/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1960. Dep: 01/05/1960. | ||
04/05/1960 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 29817 boiler fitted | ||
04/05/1960 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 3913 boiler fitted | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
03/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1961. Dep: 16/11/1961. | ||
18/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1962. Dep: 12/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
16/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1963. Dep: 29/08/1963. | ||
28/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1963. Dep: 01/11/1963. | ||
20/10/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1964. Dep: 07/11/1964. | ||
09/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1964. Dep: 10/11/1964. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60154 from Neville Hill (55H) |