|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1930 | 27/03/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1931 | 18/04/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1932 | 16/07/1932 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1933 | 13/04/1933 | 64 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1935 | 21/03/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1935 | 13/07/1935 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1935 | 12/11/1935 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1936 | 22/04/1936 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1936 | 10/05/1936 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 45 days | General | Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1937 | 24/11/1937 | 31 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5574 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1938 | 02/06/1938 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27019 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1942 | 09/07/1942 | 76 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9485 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1947 | 14/06/1947 | 38 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1949 | 13/04/1949 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60092 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1950 | 17/11/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1950 | 01/12/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1952 | 19/08/1952 | 35 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1953 | 03/12/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27042 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1955 | 17/03/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1956 | 11/07/1956 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1956 | 21/11/1956 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1958 | 19/06/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1959 | 27/02/1959 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1959 | 13/11/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1961 | 12/04/1961 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1961 | 25/10/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 94HP) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1961 | 08/11/1961 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on shed) | Ex-Works on shed: D5818/9 new, 43062, 60012/50/92, 61361, 63922, 62040; also 61444 ex-Darlington Works. | SLS/196112 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/10/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2746, name: FAIRWAY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1700 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5326 | ||
10/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1930. Dep: 27/03/1930. | ||
04/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931. | ||
03/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
09/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/02/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933. | ||
09/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. | ||
14/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1935. Dep: 21/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
08/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935. | ||
24/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1935. Dep: 12/11/1935. | ||
28/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. | ||
20/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1936. Dep: 22/04/1936. | ||
28/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1936. Dep: 10/05/1936. | ||
10/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
15/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
14/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
11/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
25/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1937. Dep: 24/11/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5574 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
22/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1938. Dep: 02/06/1938. | ||
20/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27019 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
18/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. | ||
25/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1942. Dep: 09/07/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
09/07/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
11/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 555 but not taken up | ||
27/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9485 (Diagram 94A) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 92 | ||
08/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
14/06/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
01/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1949. Dep: 13/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60092 |
||
17/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
28/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950. | ||
16/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1952. Dep: 19/08/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
19/08/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
27/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 03/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27042 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
10/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1956. Dep: 11/07/1956. | ||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 21/11/1956. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
11/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1958. Dep: 19/06/1958. | ||
07/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1959. Dep: 27/02/1959. | ||
01/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
17/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. | ||
03/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1961. Dep: 12/04/1961. | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
18/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 25/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 94HP) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
02/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1961. Dep: 08/11/1961. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60092 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |