|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1929 | 18/07/1929 | 23 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8082 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1932 | 06/02/1933 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1933 | 22/05/1933 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1934 | 10/03/1934 | 52 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1935 | 20/04/1935 | 39 days | General | Tender number 5280 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1936 | 26/06/1936 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1936 | 13/11/1936 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1938 | 14/04/1938 | 11 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1938 | 23/01/1939 | 47 days | General | Tender number 5286 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 45 days | General | Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1944 | 28/04/1944 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9448 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1946 | 06/02/1946 | 31 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1947 | 08/08/1947 | 33 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1948 | 19/11/1948 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1949 | 03/02/1949 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1950 | 21/06/1950 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1951 | 16/02/1951 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1952 | 07/05/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5287 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1952 | 22/12/1952 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1954 | 11/02/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1955 | 02/05/1955 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1955 | 23/09/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1957 | 17/05/1957 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1958 | 19/12/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1960 | 02/12/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1961 | 06/01/1962 | 34 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2747, name: CORONACH Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1703 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
26/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/06/1929. Dep: 18/07/1929. | ||
17/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
31/05/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. | ||
10/09/1931 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5272 | ||
14/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8082 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
08/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1932. Dep: 06/02/1933. | ||
12/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1933. Dep: 22/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
18/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/01/1934. Dep: 10/03/1934. | ||
13/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1935. Dep: 20/04/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 5280 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
14/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1936. Dep: 26/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
09/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936. | ||
31/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. | ||
04/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1938 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5280 | ||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 23/01/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 5286 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
16/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
19/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. | ||
23/01/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
16/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. | ||
15/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
28/02/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
10/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1944. Dep: 28/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9448 (Diagram 94A) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 556 but not taken up | ||
07/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1946. Dep: 06/02/1946. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 93 | ||
07/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1947. Dep: 08/08/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
03/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. | ||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60093 | ||
01/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948. | ||
20/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1949. Dep: 03/02/1949. | ||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
09/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950. | ||
15/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1951. Dep: 16/02/1951. | ||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 07/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5287 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
07/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
08/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1952. Dep: 22/12/1952. | ||
07/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1954. Dep: 11/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) |
||
20/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1955. Dep: 02/05/1955. | ||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 23/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) |
||
02/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1957. Dep: 17/05/1957. | ||
08/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
25/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1960. Dep: 02/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) |
||
04/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1961. Dep: 06/01/1962. | ||
04/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60093 from Carlisle Canal (12C) |