|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1931 | 26/06/1931 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1932 | 25/06/1932 | 20 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1932 | 14/11/1932 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1933 | 28/06/1933 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1934 | 05/07/1934 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1936 | 16/07/1936 | 43 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1937 | 22/05/1937 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1938 | 08/07/1938 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5224 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1939 | 03/06/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1940 | 18/05/1940 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1940 | 25/01/1941 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1941 | 23/11/1941 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1942 | 09/12/1942 | 59 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1943 | 02/02/1943 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1943 | 27/12/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9450 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1944 | 22/12/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 558 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1947 | 29/08/1947 | 40 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1949 | 11/02/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8781 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1950 | 15/12/1950 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1952 | 28/05/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27023 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1954 | 19/02/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5637 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1955 | 02/09/1955 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1957 | 13/07/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1958 | 06/02/1959 | 46 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1961 | 01/04/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
22/12/1950 | Rare \"A3\" sighting | A very rare bird in the south, was the Carlisle 'A3' No. 60095 Flamingo which worked from King's Cross on the 1.45 p.m. relief down express on 22nd December. | SLS/195102 |
18/04/1953 | Scottish Miscellany | The 7.0 p.m. Edinburgh (Waverley) to Glasgow (Queen Street) Sundays only train has this year produced a number of York 50A locos. These include 60140 (three times), 60501 an 60515 (twice), 60502 an 60512. Also seen on this train 60095 (68E), 60965 (64A), 60823 (64A). This train is worked off St. Margarets depot, the engine returning on the Monday morning. No. 67500 a 4-4-2T has occasionally appeared on the Hyndland and Milngavie trains during recent weeks. New loco. No. 76000 was noted on (23/4) on local goods to Buchanan Street. B.R. 2-6-4T are now fairly regularly used on 5.51 p.m. Carlisle to Glasgow (St. Enoch). Water is taken at Dumfries and often at Kilmarnock. With 80008 some excellent work was experienced. A late start of 11 mins. at Carlisle was reduced to a late arrival at Dumfries of 5 mins. A late start from Dumfries of 8 minutes was converted to a 2 min. early arrival at Kilmarnock. Up the Nith Valley 50 m.p.h. was regularly got with eight coaches. From Kilmarnock to a stop at Gorbals Jct. the time was 30 mins. 46 secs. including a 15 m.p.h. crawl from Strathbungo. Between Shilford and Neilson 77 m.p.h. was reached. The crew appeared to have no trouble with the train at any time, in fact one would suggest their only trouble was to hold the engine in check, so freely did it run. 40185 (2-6-2T) has been working the Kirkcudbright branch recently. On occasion of Cup Final in Glasgow on (23/4) the bulk of the trains from Aberdeen were worked by L.M. Class 5, 4-6-0, assisted by 61400 of Kittybrewster depot and 60531 Bahram. |
SLS/195306 |
31/03/1954 | York Area | The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition. Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953). |
SLS/195404 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/01/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2749, name: FLAMINGO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1707 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
06/02/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5330 | ||
20/03/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5275 | ||
26/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/05/1931. Dep: 26/06/1931. | ||
25/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. | ||
06/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. | ||
31/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1932. Dep: 14/11/1932. | ||
11/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1933. Dep: 28/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
08/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934. | ||
23/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. | ||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. | ||
04/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/06/1936. Dep: 16/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
14/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1937. Dep: 22/05/1937. | ||
09/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1938. Dep: 08/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5224 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939. | ||
16/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940. | ||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 25/01/1941. | ||
27/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1941. Dep: 23/11/1941. | ||
12/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1942. Dep: 09/12/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
09/12/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
27/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1943. Dep: 02/02/1943. | ||
13/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1943. Dep: 27/12/1943. | ||
04/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9450 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944. | ||
09/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 558 |
||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 95 | ||
21/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1947. Dep: 29/08/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60095 | ||
07/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8781 (Diagram 94A) |
||
10/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27023 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
28/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
18/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1954. Dep: 19/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5637 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
28/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955. | ||
25/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107) |
||
23/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1958. Dep: 06/02/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/04/1961. Dep: 01/04/1961. | ||
10/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60095 from Carlisle Canal (12C) |