|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1929 | 24/10/1929 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1930 | 30/05/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1930 | 23/10/1930 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1931 | 13/06/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1932 | 10/08/1932 | 48 days | General | Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8253 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1934 | 19/01/1935 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1935 | 27/02/1935 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1935 | 18/04/1935 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1935 | 24/06/1935 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1936 | 26/02/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1936 | 02/06/1936 | 20 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1936 | 07/10/1936 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1936 | 27/11/1936 | 15 days | Heavy | Tender number 5292 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1937 | 04/06/1937 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1937 | 07/09/1937 | 2 days | Unclassified | Tender change onIy Tender number 5581 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1937 | 22/10/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | Alteration to Blow-down |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1938 | 15/12/1938 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1940 | 02/08/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9216 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1943 | 20/05/1943 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1944 | 29/11/1944 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1946 | 16/05/1946 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1947 | 15/12/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1948 | 27/10/1948 | 16 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 60096 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1949 | 25/08/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 9985 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1949 | 12/12/1949 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1950 | 11/01/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27023 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27075 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1953 | 12/11/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5270 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 03/05/1954 | 24/05/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1955 | 22/04/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1955 | 21/11/1955 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1956 | 11/10/1956 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1958 | 23/07/1958 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1959 | 23/01/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1961 | 15/09/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/10/1954 | Carlisle | On the 18th and 21st October, Class A3 Pacifics were worked over the Settle-Carlisle line without change of engine between Edinburgh and Leeds on the 10.5 a.m. to St. Pancras. On the latter day, No. 60096 of Haymarket was observed arriving at Leeds 13 minutes late, having been delayed at Carlisle 19 minutes waiting for a connection delayed by the floods. It is understood that this working may become a regular feature. | SLS/195411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/02/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2750, name: PAPYRUS Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number l708 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
29/06/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5331 | ||
23/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1929. Dep: 24/10/1929. | ||
11/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1930. Dep: 30/05/1930. | ||
21/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1930. Dep: 23/10/1930. | ||
29/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. | ||
24/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1932. Dep: 10/08/1932. Work undertaken: Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
20/01/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5331 | ||
18/07/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5225 | ||
06/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8253 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
24/08/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5327 | ||
29/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1934. Dep: 19/01/1935. | ||
22/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1935. Dep: 27/02/1935. | ||
10/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1935. Dep: 18/04/1935. | ||
18/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1935. Dep: 24/06/1935. | ||
08/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 26/02/1936. | ||
14/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/05/1936. Dep: 02/06/1936. | ||
28/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1936. Dep: 07/10/1936. | ||
13/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/11/1936. Dep: 27/11/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 5292 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
19/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937. | ||
30/06/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
14/08/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
06/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1937. Dep: 07/09/1937. Work undertaken: Tender change onIy Tender number 5581 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
08/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
12/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1937. Dep: 22/10/1937. Work undertaken: Alteration to Blow-down |
||
18/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
12/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1938. Dep: 15/12/1938. | ||
11/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
03/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. | ||
26/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1940. Dep: 02/08/1940. | ||
24/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. | ||
06/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9216 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
08/05/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
17/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1943. Dep: 20/05/1943. | ||
21/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1944. Dep: 29/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 559 but not taken up | ||
28/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1946. Dep: 16/05/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 96 | ||
07/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1947. Dep: 15/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
12/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60096 |
||
18/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9985 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
01/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1949. Dep: 12/12/1949. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
05/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1950. Dep: 11/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27023 (Diagram 94A) |
||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27075 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
03/04/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
08/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 12/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5270 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
03/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1954. Dep: 24/05/1954. | ||
18/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1955. Dep: 22/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1955. Dep: 21/11/1955. | ||
17/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1956. Dep: 11/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/06/1957 | Report | Report: "B1" No. 61111 (34E) was on Neville Hill shed. The "B1" had arrived with empty stock from Newcastle and that evening returned as pilot to "A4" No. 60096 (64B), ex-works and carrying a "CTAC Scottish Tours Express" headboard, on a 17-bogie haul of parcels vans. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
22/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 23/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. | ||
10/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1959. Dep: 23/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1961. Dep: 15/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
13/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60096 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |