|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1931 | 28/05/1931 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1932 | 05/07/1932 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1933 | 26/06/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1933 | 20/12/1933 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1934 | 02/01/1935 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1935 | 26/01/1935 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1935 | 13/12/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1937 | 22/10/1937 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1938 | 25/11/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1939 | 25/11/1939 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1940 | 28/11/1940 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5645 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1942 | 22/03/1942 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 45 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1943 | 31/12/1943 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1944 | 26/05/1944 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1945 | 15/03/1945 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9567 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1947 | 27/02/1947 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1947 | 18/12/1947 | 39 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1948 | 14/01/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1948 | 31/05/1948 | 13 days | Light Repair | Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60084 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1949 | 01/06/1949 | 43 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1951 | 29/03/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27036 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1951 | 22/06/1951 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1952 | 08/08/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1952 | 17/11/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1953 | 27/01/1953 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1953 | 28/01/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27045 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1957 | 28/05/1957 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1958 | 10/07/1958 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1959 | 09/12/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1960 | 22/09/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1961 | 18/01/1962 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/02/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2595, name: TRIGO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1731 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
10/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1931. Dep: 28/05/1931. | ||
18/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 05/07/1932. | ||
19/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1933. Dep: 26/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
12/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1933. Dep: 20/12/1933. | ||
17/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 02/01/1935. | ||
19/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935. | ||
30/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1935. Dep: 13/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
12/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. | ||
16/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1937. Dep: 22/10/1937. | ||
14/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1938. Dep: 25/11/1938. | ||
18/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939. | ||
14/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1940. Dep: 28/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5645 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
02/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1942. Dep: 22/03/1942. | ||
20/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
23/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1943. Dep: 31/12/1943. | ||
11/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1944. Dep: 26/05/1944. | ||
21/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1945. Dep: 15/03/1945. | ||
04/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 562 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 84 | ||
31/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9567 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
26/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1947. Dep: 27/02/1947. | ||
10/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1947. Dep: 18/12/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
03/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1948. Dep: 14/01/1948. | ||
19/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1948. Dep: 31/05/1948. Work undertaken: Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60084 |
||
31/05/1948 | Livery | Change of livery to Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining | ||
20/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1949. Dep: 01/06/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
21/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1951. Dep: 29/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27036 (Diagram 94A) |
||
05/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 22/06/1951. | ||
08/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1952. Dep: 08/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
11/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 17/11/1952. | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 27/01/1953. | ||
29/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1953. Dep: 28/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
12/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) |
||
30/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27045 (Diagram 94A) |
||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 28/05/1957. | ||
21/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1958. Dep: 10/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
06/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1959. Dep: 09/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) |
||
20/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1960. Dep: 22/09/1960. | ||
08/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1961. Dep: 18/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
08/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60084 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |