Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 455 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6209 Week
» 34167 Month
» 68809 Year
» 1290374 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2796   17/05/1930
LNER (1946 1st) 568   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 100   20/07/1946
BR 60100   13/04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
17/05/1930 SPEARMINT

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 17/05/1930
LNER Black Unlined 03/1943
LNER Apple Green Black and White 06/1947
BR Blue Black and White 03/1951
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 02/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A3
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 317
Works Number 1741
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Sat 17/05/1930 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Sat 19/06/1965 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 06/1965
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Non-Corridor 5480 17/05/1930 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5332 30/06/1930 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5640 25/03/1937 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5275 07/07/1938 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5286 04/07/1947 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5283 13/04/1949 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Non-Corridor 5566 03/09/1952 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for repair 31/5/65 but condemned and cut-up

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) 17/05/1930
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 04/04/1937
HAY Haymarket 06/03/1938
EFD Eastfield 19/07/1938
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 05/10/1940
HAY Haymarket 14/12/1940
64A St Margarets 06/01/1963
   Withdrawn 19/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 2w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   w/e 19/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/05/1930 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8247)
11/04/1933 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8031)
04/04/1935 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8078)
25/03/1937 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8076)
08/10/1941 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8077)
24/11/1947 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9213)
13/04/1949 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9117)
03/09/1952 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27036)
03/1956 To 75% Cut-off
25/09/1958 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27047)
07/1959 Double Chimney fitted
06/1961 Trough deflectors fitted
17/08/1961 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27057)
13/08/1962 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27063)

Reports
Report Date Report
11/06/1957 On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton."


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/04/1931 16/05/1931 46 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/05/1932 23/06/1932 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/02/1933 11/04/1933 49 days General
Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP)
 
Doncaster Works 16/03/1934 15/05/1934 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1935 04/04/1935 38 days General
Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP)
 
Doncaster Works 07/02/1936 26/03/1936 49 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/01/1937 25/03/1937 56 days General
Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP)
Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1938 07/07/1938 38 days General
Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 26/08/1939 13/10/1939 49 days General
Hudd ATC f1tted
 
Doncaster Works 25/08/1941 08/10/1941 45 days General
Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP)
 
Doncaster Works 28/01/1942 04/02/1942 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/01/1943 07/02/1943 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/11/1943 11/01/1944 47 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/04/1945 09/06/1945 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/06/1946 20/07/1946 40 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 100
 
Doncaster Works 20/10/1947 24/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1949 13/04/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 9117 (Diagram 94A)
Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60100
 
Doncaster Works 09/10/1950 15/11/1950 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/08/1952 03/09/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 27036 (Diagram 94A)
Tender number 5566 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 15/01/1954 17/02/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 9570 (Diagram 94HP)
 
Doncaster Works 09/07/1955 15/08/1955 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/12/1956 16/01/1957 45 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 14/03/1957 20/03/1957 7 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1957 30/04/1957 7 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/11/1957 22/11/1957 22 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/08/1958 25/09/1958 52 days General
Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 26/08/1959 26/09/1959 32 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 08/06/1960 28/07/1960 51 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/07/1961 17/08/1961 25 days Light Casual
Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/05/1962 13/08/1962 91 days General
Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/05/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2796, name: SPEARMINT
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1741
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor
Diagram 94HP boiler fitted
   
30/06/1930 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5332    
01/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931.    
10/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1932. Dep: 23/06/1932.    
22/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1933. Dep: 11/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP)
   
16/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1934. Dep: 15/05/1934.    
26/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 04/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP)
   
07/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1936. Dep: 26/03/1936.    
29/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1937. Dep: 25/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP)
Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
   
04/04/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
06/03/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
31/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1938. Dep: 07/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
   
19/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
26/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 13/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Hudd ATC f1tted
   
05/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
14/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
25/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1941. Dep: 08/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP)
   
28/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1942. Dep: 04/02/1942.    
06/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1943. Dep: 07/02/1943.    
03/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
26/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1943. Dep: 11/01/1944.    
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 568 but not taken up    
11/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 100
   
06/1947 Livery Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining    
04/07/1947 Tender Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5286    
20/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1947. Dep: 24/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A)
   
03/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 13/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9117 (Diagram 94A)
Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60100
   
09/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 15/11/1950.    
03/1951 Livery Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.    
06/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 03/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27036 (Diagram 94A)
Tender number 5566 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached.
   
02/1953 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
15/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1954. Dep: 17/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9570 (Diagram 94HP)
   
09/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1955. Dep: 15/08/1955.    
03/1956 Modification Modification: To 75% Cut-off    
03/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 16/01/1957.    
14/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957.    
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 30/04/1957.    
11/06/1957 Report Report: On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton." (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
01/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957.    
05/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 25/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A)
   
07/1959 Modification Modification: Double Chimney fitted    
26/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1959. Dep: 26/09/1959.    
08/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1960. Dep: 28/07/1960.    
06/1961 Modification Modification: Trough deflectors fitted    
24/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/07/1961. Dep: 17/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A)
   
15/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1962. Dep: 13/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A)
   
06/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
19/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60100 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev