|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1931 | 16/05/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1932 | 23/06/1932 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1933 | 11/04/1933 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1934 | 15/05/1934 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1935 | 04/04/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1936 | 26/03/1936 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1937 | 25/03/1937 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1938 | 07/07/1938 | 38 days | General | Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1939 | 13/10/1939 | 49 days | General | Hudd ATC f1tted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1941 | 08/10/1941 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1942 | 04/02/1942 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1943 | 07/02/1943 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1943 | 11/01/1944 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 100 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1947 | 24/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1949 | 13/04/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60100 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1950 | 15/11/1950 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1952 | 03/09/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27036 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5566 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1954 | 17/02/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1955 | 15/08/1955 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1956 | 16/01/1957 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1957 | 20/03/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1957 | 30/04/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1957 | 22/11/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1958 | 25/09/1958 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1959 | 26/09/1959 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1960 | 28/07/1960 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1961 | 17/08/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1962 | 13/08/1962 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
31/03/1954 | York Area | The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition. Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953). |
SLS/195404 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/05/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2796, name: SPEARMINT Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1741 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5332 | ||
01/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931. | ||
10/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1932. Dep: 23/06/1932. | ||
22/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1933. Dep: 11/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
16/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1934. Dep: 15/05/1934. | ||
26/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 04/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
07/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1936. Dep: 26/03/1936. | ||
29/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1937. Dep: 25/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
04/04/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
06/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
31/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1938. Dep: 07/07/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
19/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
26/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 13/10/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd ATC f1tted |
||
05/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
14/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
25/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1941. Dep: 08/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
28/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1942. Dep: 04/02/1942. | ||
06/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1943. Dep: 07/02/1943. | ||
26/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1943. Dep: 11/01/1944. | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 568 but not taken up | ||
11/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 100 |
||
04/07/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5286 | ||
20/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1947. Dep: 24/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A) |
||
03/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 13/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60100 |
||
09/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 15/11/1950. | ||
03/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
06/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 03/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27036 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5566 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
15/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1954. Dep: 17/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
09/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1955. Dep: 15/08/1955. | ||
03/1956 | Modification | Modification: To 75% Cut-off | ||
03/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 16/01/1957. | ||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957. | ||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 30/04/1957. | ||
11/06/1957 | Report | Report: On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton." (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
01/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957. | ||
05/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 25/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/1959 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
26/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1959. Dep: 26/09/1959. | ||
08/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1960. Dep: 28/07/1960. | ||
06/1961 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
24/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/07/1961. Dep: 17/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27057 (Diagram 94A) |
||
15/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1962. Dep: 13/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60100 from St Margarets (64A) |