Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 488 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4124 Week
» 23769 Month
» 58411 Year
» 1279976 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2598   14/06/1930
LNER (1946 1st) 565   21/03/1946
LNER (1946 2nd) 87   27/10/1946
BR 60087   20/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
14/06/1930 BLENHEIM

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 14/06/1930
LNER Black Unlined 02/1943
LNER Apple Green Black and White 11/1947
BR Blue Black and White 11/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 09/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A3
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 317
Works Number 1743
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 14/06/1930 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 28/10/1963 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 33 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Non-Corridor 5482 14/06/1930 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Non-Corridor 5572 21/10/1936 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5255 07/11/1957 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Non-Corridor 5572 18/12/1957 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap t0 Arnott Young, Carmy1e 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) 14/06/1930
DON Doncaster 29/07/1937
GHD Gateshead 13/10/1937
HAY Haymarket 16/10/1937
GHD Gateshead 08/02/1938
HAY Haymarket 09/03/1939
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 20/07/1940
HAY Haymarket 18/10/1941
64A St Margarets 13/07/1960
64B Haymarket 28/11/1960
64A St Margarets 03/12/1961
   Withdrawn 28/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 17/12/1960
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 6w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   28/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/06/1930 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8249)
18/11/1932 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8078)
07/01/1935 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8079)
21/10/1936 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8250)
10/06/1944 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9449)
17/08/1950 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9121)
04/07/1952 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27027)
16/11/1956 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27050)
01/1957 To 75% Cut-off
12/08/1958 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27006)
09/1958 Double Chimney fitted
08/1961 Trough deflectors fitted
02/02/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29306)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 08/10/1931 13/11/1931 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/10/1932 18/11/1932 47 days General
Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP)
 
Doncaster Works 12/10/1933 24/11/1933 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/11/1934 07/01/1935 47 days General
Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP)
 
Doncaster Works 28/11/1935 24/01/1936 58 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/09/1936 21/10/1936 51 days General
Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP)
Tender number 5572 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1937 10/07/1937 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/11/1937 15/12/1937 29 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 26/04/1938 27/04/1938 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/11/1938 17/01/1939 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/03/1940 03/05/1940 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/08/1941 05/10/1941 46 days General  
Cowlairs Works 12/05/1942 29/05/1942 18 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1942 21/10/1942 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/05/1944 10/06/1944 33 days General
Boiler number 9449 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 20/08/1945 04/10/1945 46 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/02/1946 21/03/1946 22 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 565
 
Doncaster Works 23/12/1946 17/01/1947 26 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/05/1947 26/06/1947 42 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 30/08/1948 20/10/1948 52 days General
Renumbered to BR 60087
 
Doncaster Works 11/07/1950 17/08/1950 38 days General
Boiler number 9121 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 28/05/1952 04/07/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 25/11/1953 04/01/1954 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1954 11/01/1955 29 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 28/07/1955 02/09/1955 37 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/10/1956 16/11/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/11/1957 04/12/1957 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/07/1958 12/08/1958 43 days General
Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 21/12/1959 03/02/1960 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/05/1960 19/07/1960 50 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1961 02/02/1962 51 days General
Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2598, name: BLENHEIM
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1743
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor
Diagram 94HP boiler fitted
   
08/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1931. Dep: 13/11/1931.    
03/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1932. Dep: 18/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP)
   
12/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1933. Dep: 24/11/1933.    
22/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1934. Dep: 07/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP)
   
28/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1935. Dep: 24/01/1936.    
01/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1936. Dep: 21/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP)
Tender number 5572 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached.
   
31/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.    
29/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
13/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
16/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
17/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/11/1937. Dep: 15/12/1937.    
08/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
26/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1938. Dep: 27/04/1938.    
29/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1938. Dep: 17/01/1939.    
09/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
08/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1940. Dep: 03/05/1940.    
20/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
21/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1941. Dep: 05/10/1941.    
18/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
12/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1942. Dep: 29/05/1942.    
23/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 21/10/1942.    
02/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
09/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9449 (Diagram 94A)
   
20/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1945. Dep: 04/10/1945.    
28/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/02/1946. Dep: 21/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 565
   
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 87    
23/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1946. Dep: 17/01/1947.    
16/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 26/06/1947.    
11/1947 Livery Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining    
30/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 20/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60087
   
11/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 17/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9121 (Diagram 94A)
   
11/1950 Livery Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.    
28/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A)
   
09/1952 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
25/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 04/01/1954.    
14/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1954. Dep: 11/01/1955.    
28/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955.    
09/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A)
   
01/1957 Modification Modification: To 75% Cut-off    
07/11/1957 Tender Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5255    
15/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1957. Dep: 04/12/1957.    
18/12/1957 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5572    
01/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 12/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A)
   
09/1958 Modification Modification: Double Chimney fitted    
21/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1959. Dep: 03/02/1960.    
31/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 19/07/1960.    
13/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
28/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
08/1961 Modification Modification: Trough deflectors fitted    
03/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
14/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1961. Dep: 02/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107)
   
28/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60087 from St Margarets (64A)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev