|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1932 | 25/11/1932 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1932 | 16/12/1932 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1933 | 06/12/1933 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8223 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1934 | 01/02/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1935 | 04/01/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1936 | 07/11/1936 | 38 days | General | Tender number 5569 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1937 | 18/09/1937 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1938 | 28/04/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1938 | 12/11/1938 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1939 | 11/07/1939 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1939 | 27/01/1940 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1941 | 27/06/1941 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1943 | 11/03/1943 | 32 days | General | Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1944 | 10/11/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1945 | 10/01/1946 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1946 | 02/08/1946 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 88 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1947 | 12/06/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1949 | 25/02/1949 | 38 days | General | Tender number 5263 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1950 | 10/02/1950 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1952 | 10/04/1952 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1953 | 11/02/1953 | 5 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/03/1954 | 03/03/1954 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1954 | 14/10/1954 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1956 | 02/03/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1957 | 27/09/1957 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27075 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1958 | 21/08/1958 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1959 | 01/07/1959 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1961 | 09/06/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
31/07/1961 | Modified class A3\'s outshopped | Further Class A3 Pacifics out-shopped ex-Doncaster Works with Dia. 107 boilers have been 60067 Ladas during April, followed by 60075 St. Frusquin in May, whilst trough-pattern smoke deflectors were fitted to 60088 Book Law during June, and 60077 The White Knight and 60099 Call Boy in July. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2599 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1744 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
04/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. | ||
04/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1932. Dep: 25/11/1932. | ||
14/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1932. Dep: 16/12/1932. | ||
17/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1933. Dep: 06/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8223 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
28/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1934. Dep: 01/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
21/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 04/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
01/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 5569 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
16/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1937. Dep: 18/09/1937. | ||
08/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
23/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
28/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1938. Dep: 28/04/1938. | ||
07/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1938. Dep: 12/11/1938. | ||
08/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1939. Dep: 11/07/1939. | ||
11/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1939. Dep: 27/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
13/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1941. Dep: 27/06/1941. | ||
08/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1943. Dep: 11/03/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
09/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1944. Dep: 10/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
28/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1945. Dep: 10/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 566 but not taken up | ||
22/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1946. Dep: 02/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 88 |
||
08/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1947. Dep: 12/06/1947. | ||
15/07/1948 | Modification | Diagram 94A number 27035 boiler fitted | ||
15/07/1948 | Modification | Diagram 94A number 9209 boiler fitted | ||
15/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60088 | ||
19/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1949. Dep: 25/02/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 5263 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
19/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1950. Dep: 10/02/1950. | ||
09/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952. | ||
07/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
01/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1954. Dep: 03/03/1954. | ||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 14/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
10/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. | ||
17/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1956. Dep: 02/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/1957 | Modification | Modification: To 75% Cut-off | ||
17/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1957. Dep: 27/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27075 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1958. Dep: 21/08/1958. | ||
02/1959 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 01/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
22/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 09/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) |
||
16/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
15/05/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5291 | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60088 from Gateshead (52A) |