|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1935 | 16/07/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1936 | 09/07/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1936 | 18/12/1936 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1937 | 24/06/1937 | 35 days | General | Tender number 5583 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1938 | 29/07/1938 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1939 | 27/04/1939 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1940 | 25/04/1940 | 8 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 47 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1942 | 02/04/1942 | 46 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/09/1942 | 25/09/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1943 | 19/10/1943 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1945 | 21/09/1945 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1947 | 13/03/1947 | 50 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1948 | 22/09/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9512 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1949 | 20/01/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1951 | 06/09/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1952 | 29/01/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1954 | 20/01/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1955 | 22/03/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1956 | 19/06/1956 | 36 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/10/1957 | 20/11/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1958 | 18/04/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1959 | 09/04/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1959 | 30/09/1959 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1961 | 02/06/1961 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27960 (Diagram 107) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Stripping) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2503, name: FIRDAUSSI Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1793 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94A boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1935. Dep: 16/07/1935. | ||
04/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1936. Dep: 09/07/1936. | ||
14/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1936. Dep: 18/12/1936. | ||
21/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1937. Dep: 24/06/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5583 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
03/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. | ||
14/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1938. Dep: 29/07/1938. | ||
27/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1939. Dep: 27/04/1939. | ||
30/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
10/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
18/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1940. Dep: 25/04/1940. | ||
17/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. | ||
16/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1942. Dep: 02/04/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
02/04/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
08/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1942. Dep: 25/09/1942. | ||
04/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
09/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1943. Dep: 19/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
16/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. | ||
12/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1945. Dep: 21/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 573 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 38 | ||
23/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1947. Dep: 13/03/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
13/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
10/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60038 | ||
30/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1948. Dep: 22/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9512 (Diagram 94A) |
||
12/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 20/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
09/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 06/09/1951. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
06/09/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 29/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) |
||
22/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 20/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off |
||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 22/03/1955. | ||
15/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1956. Dep: 19/06/1956. | ||
19/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
30/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1957. Dep: 20/11/1957. | ||
07/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1958. Dep: 18/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) |
||
19/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1959. Dep: 09/04/1959. | ||
11/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1959. Dep: 30/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) Double Chimney fitted |
||
21/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
19/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1961. Dep: 02/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27960 (Diagram 107) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
18/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60038 from Neville Hill (55H) |