|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1935 | 15/03/1935 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1935 | 24/05/1935 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1935 | 23/11/1935 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1936 | 13/11/1936 | 39 days | General | Tender number 5253 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1937 | 13/11/1937 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1939 | 23/05/1939 | 16 days | Special | For test purposes |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1939 | 20/01/1940 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1940 | 30/01/1941 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1941 | 09/05/1941 | 16 days | Heavy | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1942 | 29/11/1942 | 34 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1943 | 17/06/1943 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1944 | 27/04/1944 | 38 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1945 | 02/09/1945 | 63 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1948 | 31/08/1948 | 54 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60040 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1949 | 01/12/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1950 | 24/01/1951 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1952 | 23/05/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1953 | 18/08/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/07/1954 | 16/07/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/02/1955 | 25/02/1955 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1955 | 14/07/1955 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/07/1956 | 14/07/1956 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1956 | 04/10/1956 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1957 | 04/10/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1961 | 28/04/1961 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1962 | 24/03/1962 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1963 | 19/12/1963 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/10/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5566 | ||
27/10/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2505, name: CAMERONIAN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1795 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94A boiler fitted |
||
05/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1935. Dep: 15/03/1935. | ||
06/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1935. Dep: 24/05/1935. | ||
15/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935. | ||
06/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 5253 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
16/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
12/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937. | ||
19/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. | ||
08/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 08/05/1939. Dep: 23/05/1939. Work undertaken: For test purposes |
||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
09/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
13/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1940. Dep: 30/01/1941. | ||
24/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/04/1941. Dep: 09/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) |
||
27/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1942. Dep: 29/11/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
29/11/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
28/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/05/1943. Dep: 17/06/1943. | ||
21/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/03/1944. Dep: 27/04/1944. | ||
02/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1945. Dep: 02/09/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 575 | ||
11/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 40 | ||
11/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
09/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1948. Dep: 31/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60040 |
||
24/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 01/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
01/12/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
19/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 24/01/1951. | ||
24/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1952. Dep: 23/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
23/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
18/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1953. Dep: 18/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
21/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1954. Dep: 16/07/1954. | ||
17/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 25/02/1955. | ||
20/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1956. Dep: 14/07/1956. | ||
06/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1956. Dep: 04/10/1956. | ||
16/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1957. Dep: 04/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
19/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. | ||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
25/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. | ||
01/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
19/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
16/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. | ||
12/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1962. Dep: 24/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
24/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
06/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1963. Dep: 19/12/1963. | ||
06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60040 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |