Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 615 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2730 Week
» 25236 Month
» 328426 Year
» 1549991 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2507 on 01/12/1934
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 577 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 42   10/11/1946
British Railways 60042   09/04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1934 SINGAPORE

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 01/12/1934
LNER Black Unlined 25/08/1943
LNER Apple Green Black and White 04/01/1947
BR Blue Black and White 16/12/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 18/12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A3
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 331
Works Number 1798
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 01/12/1934 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1964 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 29 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Non-Corridor 5582 01/12/1934 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5639 20/02/1937 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5229 19/11/1937 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Non-Corridor 5570 05/09/1941 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5274 25/08/1943 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5260 17/12/1952 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Carmyle 10/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) on 01/12/1934
NEV Neville Hill on 27/09/1945
GHD Gateshead on 06/05/1946
51A Darlington on 22/03/1953
52A Gateshead on 20/09/1953
51A Darlington on 07/03/1954
52A Gateshead on 05/09/1954
51A Darlington on 11/11/1956
52A Gateshead on 05/05/1957
52B Heaton on 09/09/1962
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 07/04/1963
64A St Margarets on 27/10/1963
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 51A Darlington 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 6w/e 11/05/1963
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 13/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/12/1934 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 8783)
05/09/1941 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 8782)
04/01/1947 To 75% Cut-off
12/08/1948 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9116)
16/12/1949 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9214)
17/05/1951 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27046)
04/05/1955 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27076)
08/09/1956 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27083)
05/09/1958 Double Chimney fitted
05/09/1958 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27024)
05/09/1962 Trough deflectors fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 19/12/1935 29/01/1936 42 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/01/1937 20/02/1937 45 days Casual
Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 13/10/1937 19/11/1937 38 days General
Tender number 5229 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 21/11/1938 06/01/1939 47 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/01/1940 03/02/1940 14 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/07/1941 05/09/1941 61 days General
Boiler number 8782 (Diagram 94A)
Tender number 5570 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 09/09/1942 01/10/1942 23 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1943 25/08/1943 37 days General
Tender number 5274 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 02/09/1943 12/09/1943 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 18/01/1945 03/03/1945 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1946 04/01/1947 39 days General
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
 
Doncaster Works 14/06/1948 12/08/1948 60 days General
Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/11/1949 16/12/1949 32 days General
Boiler number 9214 (Diagram 94A)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 19/04/1951 17/05/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 11/11/1952 18/12/1952 38 days General
Tender number 5260 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 18/10/1954 04/11/1954 18 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1955 04/05/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 30/07/1956 08/09/1956 41 days General
Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 30/07/1958 05/09/1958 38 days General
Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 29/03/1960 06/05/1960 39 days General
Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 08/06/1962 05/09/1962 90 days General
Trough deflectors fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/06/1948 Doncaster Works Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1934 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2507
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1798
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor
Diagram 94A boiler fitted
   
19/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1935. Dep: 29/01/1936.    
07/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
   
13/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 19/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5229 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
   
21/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1938. Dep: 06/01/1939.    
21/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.    
07/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1941. Dep: 05/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8782 (Diagram 94A)
Tender number 5570 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached.
   
09/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 01/10/1942.    
20/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1943. Dep: 25/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5274 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
25/08/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
02/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1943. Dep: 12/09/1943.    
18/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.    
27/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 577 but not taken up    
06/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 42    
27/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
   
09/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60042    
14/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1948. Dep: 12/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A)
   
15/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9214 (Diagram 94A)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
16/12/1949 Livery Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.    
19/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1951. Dep: 17/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A)
   
11/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 18/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5260 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
18/12/1952 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
22/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
07/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
05/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
18/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954.    
29/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A)
   
30/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A)
   
11/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
05/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
30/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A)
Double Chimney fitted
   
29/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A)
   
08/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1962. Dep: 05/09/1962.
Work undertaken:
Trough deflectors fitted
   
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
07/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
27/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60042 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev