Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 717 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2832 Week
» 25338 Month
» 328528 Year
» 1550093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) 2511 on 05/11/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 582 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 16   17/11/1946
British Railways 60016   11/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/08/1938 SILVER KING

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Silver Grey None 05/11/1935
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 09/08/1938
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 10/04/1943
LNER Black Unlined 02/06/1946
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 10/05/1947
BR Blue Black and White 21/10/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 10/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 338
Works Number 1821
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 05/11/1935 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Fri 19/03/1965 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5591 05/11/1935 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5636 11/06/1948 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) on 05/11/1935
GHD Gateshead on 18/11/1935
HTN Heaton on 10/11/1939
GHD Gateshead on 28/03/1943
HTN Heaton on 03/05/1943
GHD Gateshead on 06/01/1945
64A St Margarets on 28/10/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
on 10/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 19/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 19/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/11/1935 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8907)
16/03/1940 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9126)
02/04/1941 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8907)
10/04/1943 Side skirting removed
15/07/1944 To 75% Cut-off
31/01/1951 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29283)
10/07/1952 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29302)
14/01/1954 Long guard irons removed
14/01/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29313)
01/10/1955 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29304)
13/06/1957 Double Chimney fitted
17/10/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29303)
19/08/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
08/07/1960 Speedometer fitted
08/07/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27966)
17/08/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29338)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 07/02/1936 27/02/1936 21 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1936 31/07/1936 23 days Light Repair
Longer buffers fitted & number added on buffer-beam
 
Doncaster Works 07/11/1936 09/11/1936 3 days Special
Paint only
 
Doncaster Works 14/12/1936 06/02/1937 55 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/08/1937 04/09/1937 20 days General
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 20/01/1938 21/01/1938 2 days Light Repair
Larger coal space
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1938 29/03/1938 1 day Weighing  
Doncaster Works 11/06/1938 09/08/1938 60 days General
Nameplates fitted
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Named SILVER KING
 
Doncaster Works 04/09/1939 28/10/1939 55 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1940 16/03/1940 20 days General
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 21/02/1941 02/04/1941 41 days General
Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 11/03/1943 10/04/1943 31 days General
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 24/05/1944 15/07/1944 53 days General
To 75% Cut-off
 
Doncaster Works 26/04/1946 02/06/1946 38 days General
Boiler number 29288 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Gateshead Works 24/11/1946 06/12/1946 13 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 01/04/1947 10/05/1947 40 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 29/04/1948 11/06/1948 44 days General
Tender number 5636 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60016
 
Doncaster Works 13/09/1949 21/10/1949 39 days General
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Gateshead Works 30/08/1950 19/09/1950 21 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/01/1951 31/01/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 26/02/1951 09/03/1951 12 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/06/1952 10/07/1952 37 days General
Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 09/12/1953 14/01/1954 37 days General
Boiler number 29313 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
 
Gateshead Works 04/11/1954 06/11/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 16/08/1955 01/10/1955 47 days General
Boiler number 29304 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1956 05/05/1956 24 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 26/04/1957 13/06/1957 49 days General
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 04/09/1958 17/10/1958 44 days General
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 30/07/1959 19/08/1959 21 days Light Casual
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 10/05/1960 08/07/1960 60 days General
Boiler number 27966 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1962 17/08/1962 79 days General
Boiler number 29338 (Diagram 107)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1946 General An interesting recent event, which so far has apparently passed un-noticed, was the completion of sixty years' service by Class 'J21' 0-6-0 No. 16. No. 16 was built at Gateshead works in September, 1886, and was the first of Mr. Thomas W. Worsdell's N.E.R. Class `C' two-cylinder compound goods locomotives. Its performance was so satisfactory that, during the next six years, no less than 170 more were built to the same design. In addition, there were thirty very similar Class 'C.1' non-compound 0-6-0's. After the compounds had been displaced, to some extent, from main line duties, the advantages of compounding were outweighed by other considerations, and, from about 1903, they were gradually rebuilt as simples. They have since been used on all classes of traffic, including express passenger trains, on which they frequently attain very high speeds. By 31st December, 1946,- four more of Mr. T. W. Worsdell's N.E.R. locos had reached their Diamond Jubilee, these comprising three Class 'B1' 0-6-2T's (L.N.E.R. Class 'N.8') and one Class 'E' 0-6-0T (L.N.E.R. Class 'J71'). In addition one of Mr. Worsdell's excellent G.E.R. 'Y.14' class 0-6-0's (L.N.E.R. Class 'J15') has also completed sixty years' service. SLS/194702
10/05/1947 Doncaster Works Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). SLS/194708
11/08/1959 Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay) Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. SLS/195909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2511
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1821
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Livery applied: Three shades of grey - silver, battleship and charcoal. Silver letters with blue shading
Tender fitted: LNER Corridor
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
18/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
07/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1936. Dep: 27/02/1936.    
09/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1936. Dep: 31/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Longer buffers fitted & number added on buffer-beam
   
07/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 07/11/1936. Dep: 09/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Paint only
   
14/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1936. Dep: 06/02/1937.    
16/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
20/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1938. Dep: 21/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space
   
29/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 29/03/1938.    
11/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 09/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Nameplates fitted
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Named SILVER KING
   
04/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939.    
10/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
26/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
   
21/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1941. Dep: 02/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107)
   
11/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
10/04/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
24/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
   
06/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 582 but not taken up    
26/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1946. Dep: 02/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29288 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
02/06/1946 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 16    
24/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1946. Dep: 06/12/1946.    
01/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
10/05/1947 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
29/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5636 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60016
   
13/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1949. Dep: 21/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
30/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1950. Dep: 19/09/1950.    
01/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 31/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107)
   
26/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951.    
04/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1952. Dep: 10/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
10/07/1952 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
09/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1953. Dep: 14/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29313 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
   
04/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.    
16/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29304 (Diagram 107)
   
12/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956.    
26/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1957. Dep: 13/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Double Chimney fitted
   
06/1957 Report Report: "A4" No. 60016 is now reported to have a double chimney, and the rest of the class will be converted in due course. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
04/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
   
30/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1959. Dep: 19/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
10/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1960. Dep: 08/07/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27966 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
31/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1962. Dep: 17/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29338 (Diagram 107)
   
28/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
10/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
19/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60016 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev