|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1936 | 08/05/1936 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1936 | 02/10/1936 | 36 days | Heavy | Longer buffers fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1937 | 28/05/1937 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 41 days | General | Nameplates fitted & number added to bufferbeam Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Named SILVER FOX |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1937 | 08/12/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1938 | 06/04/1938 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1938 | 23/12/1938 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1940 | 24/05/1940 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9128 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 48 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1943 | 05/08/1943 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1946 | 03/05/1946 | 50 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1947 | 25/09/1947 | 53 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1949 | 27/04/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9025 (Diagram 107) Renumbered to BR 60017 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1950 | 21/09/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1951 | 30/04/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1952 | 21/12/1952 | 33 days | H/L | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1953 | 18/02/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1953 | 19/06/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1954 | 03/11/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29324 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1955 | 31/12/1955 | 45 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1958 | 28/01/1959 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29325 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1959 | 09/10/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1960 | 16/04/1960 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1960 | 26/10/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27971 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1961 | 02/06/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1961 | 17/10/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1962 | 12/04/1962 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1963 | 15/02/1963 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
09/06/1951 | \"A4\" activity | A4 No. 60029 Woodcock, off works W/E, 9th June, will probably be nursed so as to be fit for the first non-stop 'Capitals Limited' when it eventually starts : Nos. 60017 an 60022 are possible spares, and there is also talk of giving No. 60030 a corridor tender for the same purpose. A4's continue to hold their own on the top main-line jobs; the two Pullmans (the Yorkshire and the Tees-Tyne) are more often than not hauled by them. | SLS/195107 |
14/06/1952 | \"Capitals\" A.4\'s | During the first week of the Summer service the 'Capitals' was worked by No. 60017 from the Kings X end and No. 60027 from Edinburgh. This year it had been arranged that the Kings X men should work this train with their own engines; an idea about which the men, at least, were enthusiasts There seemed every chance that the scheme might work too as the regular engines have been maintained in fine condition of late, failures on the road with one being virtually unknown. However, the second week when 60007 should have been the engine, 60033 was sent instead as the former was giving some anxiety over the amount of oil it was using. 60033 also did its own turn the following week. 60028 an 60010 should have worked the fourth and fifth weeks respectively but 60017 did both weeks. No. 60017 is, in fact, spare at the moment as its two regular drivers (Messrs. Burgess and Smith) have taken over 60022, recently out of works and painted green. No. 60027 from the Edinburgh end has worked the train (and its equivalent Sunday working) daily without a break for the five weeks mentioned above, and so far shows no signs of ceasing to do so. All the drivers who have handled it say it is in superb condition. | SLS/195209 |
06/09/1952 | G.N. Section | The summer service ended without a failure on the 'Capitals' as far as Kings X were concerned, but there were two failures from the Edinburgh end, unfortunately. After an unbroken spell of over five weeks No. 60027 ran hot during week ended 16/8/52, north of York. The scheme by which the Kings X men were to take their own engines did not work out as planned, only five out of eleven weeks being-so worked, the remainder were shared by Nos. 60017/33/34. In fact, of these three, No. 60033 ran over 10,000 miles during one period of four weeks, though even this was probably exceeded by No. 60027 during the first four weeks of the summer service. Ten of the older J52's at Hornsey are to be exchanged for a similar number of J50's from Doncaster and other sheds, in the near future. A J50 was recently tried out on the trip workings from Hornsey to the Southern Region and the transfers are possibly the result of the success of those tests. A Diesel was also tried on these trips, but no more are expected at Hornsey for the time being. The withdrawal has been announced of B17 61628 Harewood House this being the first of its class to be withdrawn and, incidentally, the first Gresley 3-cylinder class to feel the axe, apart from the A4 which was destroyed by a bomb during the war. No. 61628 was built at Darlington in 1931 as 2828, renumbered 1628 in 9/46 and 61628 in 1/49. |
SLS/195211 |
29/06/1953 | Elizabethan Express | The first 'Elizabethan' from London was in charge of A4 60028 and Driver J. Howard, and both arrived on time and intact at Edinburgh despite the combined efforts of the reporters and television cameras. Up to quite a late hour it was hoped that 60022 would be able to do the trip but several failures of minor and major importance had made the prospect unlikely, then a final test a day or two beforehand still showed a tendency for one of the motion pins to run warm, and so 60028, fairly new ex works, was quickly made ready. So far, the first month has produced only one failure; a trailing bogie on 60008 ran hot (on Monday the 13th) on her first down run, and at Dunbar a D49 took over for the short run to Edinburgh. One of the Haymarket locos., No. 60009 was suspected of being a little warm on arrival at Kings Cross, during the second week, and 60028 was sent in its place the next morning (60017 had previously taken over the Kings X working leaving 60028 in reserve), 60009 returned on its right working later. This loco. had earlier worked the first Up train, a run spoilt by a piece of cotton waste blocking the water pick-up, causing a stop at Retford for a. 'drink.' Good work by Driver Smith thereafter reduced the late arrival to only five or six minutes. 60004 has performed well from the Edinburgh end (though reported a little weak at the front end), with some help from 60031. | SLS/195310 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
04/03/1963 | GC line | Since the withdrawal of the local services from 4th March, Annesley shed now works the remaining semi-fast services (Nottingham-London) using Class 5s and Royal Scots. Woodford shed now has no passenger workings and its stud of ex LMR 2-6-4Ts (from Neasden) have been placed in store. Leicester shed has not been closed but its allocation has been reduced; on 16th March the following were on shed-42437/53/6, 44690, 45238, 45579, 48079; 46112, 60961 an 61374. Only latter was in steam. Leicester Central will be used during the summer for the former Belgrave Road station trains to Mablethorpe and Skegness (which ran on Saturdays and Sundays only). | SLS/196304 |
28/02/1963 | March MPD | Britannias 70000/1/2/3/5/6-13 were all placed in store at March in February due to further dieselisation by Type 3 diesels from Darnall and these now cover several March freight turns; three of the Britannias are understood to be unserviceable due to frost damage. On 30th March 70000/1/5/10/2 were transferred to Willesden leaving the others stored at the time. On 13th April, a visit to the shed revealed 70008/11/3 in steam acting as spare engines for diesel failures. J17 65541, which was stationary boiler here, has now been replaced by B1 61378. A new diesel depot is being built at March alongside the old repair shops and a further diesel depot is now under construction at Kings Lynn where 7 Brush and 6 small diesels are stationed. Several Brush diesels are now stabled in the old steam shed at Cambridge and 2 Brush diesels and one 204 h.p. stable at Ely. | SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 | Malton MPD | The closure of Malton shed, recently forecast, as being likely to take place this summer, actually occurred officially on and from 16th April. All Malton’s steam locos. had however left during the preceding week, and on the official day of closure, the only steam loco. at the shed was 43055 (50A), on temporary standby. The two diesel shunters are now stabled overnight on a carriage siding under that part of the station roof which covers the Whitby bay platform. Since closure of Malton shed, local goods workings between York and Malton have been covered by 2-6-Os of 43XXX and 77XXX series; one of the latter type (including 77004 still with snowplough) brings the early morning goods from York and continues with the pick-up freight to Whitby, where it is remanned. The diesel shunters have been working the thrice-weekly trip on the Gilling branch, which is now disconnected at the Pilmoor end. The Ampleforth College Special from London to Gilling on 30th April, was worked from KX to Malton by A4 60017 Silver Fox and was replaced by 2-6-0 77004 still fitted with its small snowplough. Y7 0-4-0 ex-L.N.E.R. 985 is lying derelict at Bentinck Colliery (nr. Kirkby in Ashfield) and appears to have been out of use for some time. | SLS/196304 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/12/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2512 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1823 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Three shades of grey - silver, battleship and charcoal. Silver letters with blue shading Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
23/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1936. Dep: 08/05/1936. | ||
28/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/08/1936. Dep: 02/10/1936. Work undertaken: Longer buffers fitted |
||
17/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 28/05/1937. | ||
27/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. Work undertaken: Nameplates fitted & number added to bufferbeam Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Named SILVER FOX |
||
06/11/1937 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
07/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1937. Dep: 08/12/1937. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
28/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1938. Dep: 06/04/1938. | ||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938. | ||
25/05/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5642 | ||
09/06/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5592 | ||
08/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1940. Dep: 24/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9128 (Diagram 107) |
||
06/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
21/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1943. Dep: 05/08/1943. | ||
15/08/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
19/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 583 but not taken up | ||
15/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1946. Dep: 03/05/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
03/05/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
27/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 17 | ||
04/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1947. Dep: 25/09/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
25/09/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 27/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9025 (Diagram 107) Renumbered to BR 60017 |
||
05/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. | ||
01/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
21/09/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
16/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1951. Dep: 30/04/1951. | ||
19/11/1952 | Works Visit | |||
21/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 18/02/1953. | ||
13/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1953. Dep: 19/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
29/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29324 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1955. Dep: 31/12/1955. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
09/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
11/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 28/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29325 (Diagram 107) |
||
25/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. | ||
24/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959. | ||
28/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1960. Dep: 16/04/1960. | ||
12/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 26/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27971 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
09/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1961. Dep: 02/06/1961. | ||
19/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1961. Dep: 17/10/1961. | ||
01/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1962. Dep: 12/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1963. Dep: 15/02/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60017 from New England (34E) | ||
05/12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |