Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 877 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2992 Week
» 25498 Month
» 328688 Year
» 1550253 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) 4482 on 22/12/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 584 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 23   22/11/1946
British Railways 60023   25/03/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/12/1936 GOLDEN EAGLE

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 22/12/1936
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 29/01/1938
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 10/09/1943
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 28/09/1946
BR Blue Black and White 31/08/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 04/09/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 340
Works Number 1847
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 22/12/1936 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Fri 30/10/1964 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5323 22/12/1936 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5667 25/07/1941 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw, 12/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) on 22/12/1936
HAY Haymarket on 25/02/1938
HTN Heaton on 01/08/1941
GHD Gateshead on 05/01/1942
64A St Margarets on 28/10/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
on 17/05/1964
   Withdrawn on 30/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   on 30/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/12/1936 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8945)
25/04/1940 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
26/07/1941 Side skirting removed
26/07/1941 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9126)
31/08/1949 To 75% Cut-off
04/09/1952 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29276)
01/03/1954 Long guard irons removed
01/03/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29292)
21/07/1955 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29303)
20/02/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29298)
18/09/1958 Double Chimney fitted
18/09/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29328)
23/03/1959 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
10/06/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29337)
10/01/1963 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29281)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 31/12/1936 31/12/1936 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/05/1937 04/06/1937 5 days Special
Cleaning for exhibition at New Barnet
 
Doncaster Works 28/12/1937 29/01/1938 33 days General
Larger coal space provided
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 21/06/1938 29/06/1938 9 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/01/1939 14/01/1939 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 17/03/1939 06/05/1939 51 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/04/1940 25/04/1940 18 days General
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 05/06/1941 26/07/1941 52 days General
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5667 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Side skirting removed
 
Cowlairs Works 08/10/1941 11/10/1941 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/04/1942 21/05/1942 48 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/07/1943 10/09/1943 42 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 29/08/1944 14/10/1944 47 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/08/1946 28/09/1946 45 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 22/11/1946 22/11/1946 1 day Unclassified
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 23
 
Doncaster Works 23/07/1947 23/07/1947 1 day Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 13/02/1948 25/03/1948 42 days General
Renumbered to BR 60023
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1948 13/10/1948 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 18/07/1949 31/08/1949 45 days General
To 75% Cut-off
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 22/01/1951 23/02/1951 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/08/1952 04/09/1952 30 days General
Boiler number 29276 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 23/09/1952 24/09/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1954 01/03/1954 42 days General
Boiler number 29292 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 10/06/1955 21/07/1955 42 days General
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 16/01/1957 20/02/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 24/02/1958 28/02/1958 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/07/1958 18/09/1958 52 days General
Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1959 23/03/1959 38 days Light Casual
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 08/04/1959 14/04/1959 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 28/04/1960 10/06/1960 44 days General
Speed indieator fitted
Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 17/02/1961 28/02/1961 12 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 06/11/1961 01/12/1961 26 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/11/1962 10/01/1963 51 days General
Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710
31/03/1948 Doncaster Works Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. SLS/194805
30/04/1950 Doncaster Works Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. SLS/195006
31/07/1950 Inverurie Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. SLS/195010
19/02/1961 Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. SLS/196104
12/11/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. SLS/196112
03/12/1961 Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4482, name: GOLDEN EAGLE
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1847
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: LNER Corridor
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.    
31/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Cleaning for exhibition at New Barnet
   
28/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1937. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
29/01/1938 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
25/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
21/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1938. Dep: 29/06/1938.    
07/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 14/01/1939.    
17/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939.    
08/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1940. Dep: 25/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
05/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5667 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Side skirting removed
   
01/08/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.    
05/01/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
04/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 21/05/1942.    
31/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1943. Dep: 10/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
10/09/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender    
29/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 584 but not taken up    
15/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
22/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 23
   
23/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/07/1947. Dep: 23/07/1947.    
13/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 25/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60023
   
28/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1948. Dep: 13/10/1948.    
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 31/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
22/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951.    
06/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 04/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29276 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
23/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952.    
19/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 01/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29292 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
   
10/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1955. Dep: 21/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
   
16/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1957. Dep: 20/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107)
   
24/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958.    
29/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1958. Dep: 18/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
14/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
08/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1959. Dep: 14/04/1959.    
28/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960.
Work undertaken:
Speed indieator fitted
Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107)
   
17/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1961. Dep: 28/02/1961.    
06/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1961. Dep: 01/12/1961.    
21/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1962. Dep: 10/01/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107)
   
28/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
17/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
30/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60023 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev