|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1937 | 07/01/1938 | 39 days | General | Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1938 | 23/06/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1939 | 15/03/1939 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1940 | 07/06/1940 | 45 days | General | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1941 | 06/11/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8949 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1942 | 04/06/1942 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1942 | 04/02/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1944 | 17/02/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1944 | 21/06/1944 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 54 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8945 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1948 | 18/06/1948 | 19 days | General | Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60024 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1949 | 18/03/1949 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1950 | 24/08/1950 | 34 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1952 | 12/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1952 | 15/05/1952 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1953 | 30/01/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1954 | 24/05/1954 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1955 | 19/07/1955 | 57 days | General | KINGFISHER plaques fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1956 | 19/09/1956 | 40 days | Cl/L | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1957 | 22/03/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1957 | 01/04/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 09/08/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1959 | 07/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1960 | 15/12/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | ATS fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1961 | 28/01/1961 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1961 | 15/06/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1962 | 07/07/1962 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1963 | 21/02/1963 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1964 | 05/09/1964 | 139 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1965 | 05/07/1965 | 28 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Inverurie Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 61508/21, 62273, 4483, 64490, ex-L.M.S. 15144, 15222/66, 56326, 17235/55, 57289. | SLS/195003 |
07/09/1955 | Royal Train | On 7th Sept. the Royal Train conveying Her Majesty from Ballater to Bawtry, Doncaster, was worked from Edinburgh (Waverley) to Doncaster and back by Class A4 60024. A standby engine for Berwick was provided by Greensfield Shed, Gateshead Class Al 60151 being worked light engine to Tweedmouth on the 6th Sept. | SLS/195512 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/12/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4483, name: KINGFISHER Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1848 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor |
||
08/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
30/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 07/01/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
07/01/1938 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
14/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
15/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1938. Dep: 23/06/1938. | ||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 15/03/1939. | ||
16/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
24/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1940. Dep: 07/06/1940. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
18/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1941. Dep: 06/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8949 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed |
||
23/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1942. Dep: 04/06/1942. | ||
29/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1942. Dep: 04/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
04/02/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
22/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 17/02/1944. | ||
15/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1944. Dep: 21/06/1944. | ||
24/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
30/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 585 | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 24 | ||
09/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
26/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8945 (Diagram 107) |
||
31/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948. Work undertaken: Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60024 |
||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 18/03/1949. | ||
22/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1950. Dep: 24/08/1950. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
07/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1952. Dep: 12/03/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
12/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952. | ||
29/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
05/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1954. Dep: 24/05/1954. | ||
24/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1955. Dep: 19/07/1955. Work undertaken: KINGFISHER plaques fitted |
||
11/08/1956 | Works Visit | |||
18/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
28/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 01/04/1957. | ||
09/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. | ||
09/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
01/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1959. Dep: 07/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 15/12/1960. Work undertaken: ATS fitted |
||
09/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1961. Dep: 28/01/1961. | ||
24/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1961. Dep: 15/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
02/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1962. Dep: 07/07/1962. | ||
14/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1963. Dep: 21/02/1963. | ||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
15/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
20/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1964. Dep: 05/09/1964. | ||
21/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
08/06/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/06/1965. Dep: 05/07/1965. | ||
24/08/1966 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5640 | ||
05/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60024 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |