Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 149 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 27167 Month
» 330357 Year
» 1551922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) 4483 on 26/12/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 585   30/03/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 24   05/05/1946
British Railways 60024   18/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/12/1936 KINGFISHER

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 26/12/1936
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 07/01/1938
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 04/02/1943
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 31/08/1946
BR Purple Red and Cream 18/06/1948
BR Blue Black and White 24/08/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 12/03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 340
Works Number 1848
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 26/12/1936 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Mon 05/09/1966 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5331 26/12/1936 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5329 22/03/1957 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5640 24/08/1966 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes The engine was actually allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill from 21/3/65 but this was not made official until 6/5/65
Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth, 10/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) on 26/12/1936
KX Kings Cross on 08/07/1937
HAY Haymarket on 14/01/1938
DON Doncaster on 16/03/1939
HAY Haymarket on 09/05/1939
64C Dalry Road on 09/09/1963
64A St Margarets on 15/12/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
on 21/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road on 08/09/1963
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   on 05/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/06/1940 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
06/11/1941 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8949)
06/11/1941 Side skirting removed
04/02/1943 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9028)
31/08/1946 To 75% Cut-off
14/11/1947 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8945)
30/01/1954 Long guard irons removed
30/01/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29319)
22/03/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29303)
20/08/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29326)
20/08/1958 Double Chimney fitted
07/01/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27961)
15/06/1961 Speedometer fitted
15/06/1961 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29319)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/11/1937 07/01/1938 39 days General
Larger coal space provided
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1938 23/06/1938 9 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/01/1939 15/03/1939 61 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1940 07/06/1940 45 days General
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 18/09/1941 06/11/1941 50 days General
Boiler number 8949 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
 
Doncaster Works 23/05/1942 04/06/1942 13 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/12/1942 04/02/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 22/01/1944 17/02/1944 27 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/05/1944 21/06/1944 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/02/1945 14/04/1945 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1946 31/08/1946 54 days General
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 26/09/1947 14/11/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 8945 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1948 18/06/1948 19 days General
Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining
Renumbered to BR 60024
 
Doncaster Works 07/02/1949 18/03/1949 40 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/07/1950 24/08/1950 34 days General
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 07/02/1952 12/03/1952 35 days General
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 28/04/1952 15/05/1952 18 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 29/12/1953 30/01/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 05/05/1954 24/05/1954 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/05/1955 19/07/1955 57 days General
KINGFISHER plaques fitted
 
Doncaster Works 11/08/1956 19/09/1956 40 days Cl/L  
Doncaster Works 18/02/1957 22/03/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 28/03/1957 01/04/1957 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 09/07/1958 20/08/1958 43 days General
Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1959 07/01/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 12/12/1960 15/12/1960 4 days Unclassified
ATS fitted
 
Doncaster Works 09/01/1961 28/01/1961 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1961 15/06/1961 53 days General
Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 02/06/1962 07/07/1962 36 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/01/1963 21/02/1963 39 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 20/04/1964 05/09/1964 139 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 08/06/1965 05/07/1965 28 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1950 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 61508/21, 62273, 4483, 64490, ex-L.M.S. 15144, 15222/66, 56326, 17235/55, 57289. SLS/195003
07/09/1955 Royal Train On 7th Sept. the Royal Train conveying Her Majesty from Ballater to Bawtry, Doncaster, was worked from Edinburgh (Waverley) to Doncaster and back by Class A4 60024. A standby engine for Berwick was provided by Greensfield Shed, Gateshead Class Al 60151 being worked light engine to Tweedmouth on the 6th Sept. SLS/195512
28/05/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196107
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
19/09/1964 Darlington MPD (Shed) On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/12/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4483, name: KINGFISHER
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1848
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: LNER Corridor
   
08/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
30/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 07/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
07/01/1938 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
14/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
15/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1938. Dep: 23/06/1938.    
14/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 15/03/1939.    
16/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
24/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1940. Dep: 07/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
18/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1941. Dep: 06/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8949 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
   
23/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1942. Dep: 04/06/1942.    
29/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1942. Dep: 04/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
04/02/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender    
22/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 17/02/1944.    
15/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1944. Dep: 21/06/1944.    
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945.    
30/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 585    
05/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 24    
09/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
26/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8945 (Diagram 107)
   
31/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining
Renumbered to BR 60024
   
07/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 18/03/1949.    
22/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1950. Dep: 24/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
07/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1952. Dep: 12/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
12/03/1952 Livery Change of livery to Brunswick green with orange and black lining.    
28/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952.    
29/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
   
05/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1954. Dep: 24/05/1954.    
24/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1955. Dep: 19/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
KINGFISHER plaques fitted
   
11/08/1956 Works Visit      
18/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
28/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 01/04/1957.    
09/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
01/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1959. Dep: 07/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107)
   
12/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 15/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
ATS fitted
   
09/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1961. Dep: 28/01/1961.    
24/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1961. Dep: 15/06/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
02/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1962. Dep: 07/07/1962.    
14/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1963. Dep: 21/02/1963.    
09/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
15/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
20/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1964. Dep: 05/09/1964.    
21/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
08/06/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/06/1965. Dep: 05/07/1965.    
24/08/1966 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5640    
05/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60024 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev