Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 159 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4671 Week
» 27177 Month
» 330367 Year
» 1551932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) 4485 on 20/02/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 587   18/04/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 26   26/05/1946
British Railways 60026   23/09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/02/1937 KESTREL (removed 19/09/1947)
11/11/1947 MILES BEEVOR

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 20/02/1937
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 08/12/1937
LNER Black Unlined 18/01/1942
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 12/09/1943
LNER Black Unlined 18/04/1946
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 01/11/1947
BR Blue Black and White 23/09/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 24/10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 340
Works Number 1850
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Tue 20/02/1937 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Tue 21/12/1965 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5324 20/02/1937 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5329 08/08/1943 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5675 01/10/1952 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5329 01/06/1953 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5642 20/01/1954 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 2/66 to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap but sale cancelled and engine returned to Perth 2/8/66. By 25/9/66 it was at Crewe Works and parts

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) on 20/02/1937
GHD Gateshead on 08/10/1937
HAY Haymarket on 22/01/1938
KX Kings Cross on 09/03/1939
DON Doncaster on 27/10/1947
KX Kings Cross on 26/11/1947
GRA Grantham on 11/04/1948
34A Kings Cross on 09/09/1951
34E New England on 16/06/1963
64A St Margarets on 20/10/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
on 13/04/1964
   Withdrawn on 21/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 29/06/1963
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region on 25/11/1963
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 09/05/1964
WDN   on 21/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
20/02/1937 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8948)
04/05/1940 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9127)
18/01/1942 Side skirting removed
18/04/1946 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8955)
23/09/1949 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8948)
23/09/1949 To 75% Cut-off
30/10/1950 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
26/07/1951 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29310)
20/02/1953 Long guard irons removed
24/09/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29314)
09/03/1956 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29318)
15/08/1957 Double Chimney fitted
15/08/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29282)
16/01/1959 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29327)
21/10/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27972)
21/10/1960 Speedometer fitted
01/08/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29327)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 29/10/1937 08/12/1937 41 days General
Larger coal space provided
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 12/11/1938 02/01/1939 52 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/07/1939 25/08/1939 33 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/12/1939 04/01/1940 20 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/03/1940 04/05/1940 54 days General
Boiler number 9127 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1941 18/01/1942 49 days General
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 04/02/1943 06/03/1943 31 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/08/1943 12/09/1943 35 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 08/01/1944 04/02/1944 28 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/11/1944 12/01/1945 59 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/03/1946 18/04/1946 41 days General
Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black
Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 587
 
Doncaster Works 05/02/1947 05/03/1947 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/09/1947 01/11/1947 44 days General
Renamed
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
De-named KESTREL
 
Doncaster Works 16/05/1949 20/05/1949 5 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/08/1949 23/09/1949 44 days General
Boiler number 8948 (Diagram 107)
To 75% Cut-off
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
Renumbered to BR 60026
 
Doncaster Works 24/10/1950 30/10/1950 7 days Light Repair
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 12/06/1951 26/07/1951 45 days General
Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 29/09/1952 24/10/1952 26 days General
Tender number 5675 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1953 20/02/1953 7 days Light Casual
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 07/04/1953 22/04/1953 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/08/1954 24/09/1954 40 days General
Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 04/04/1955 12/05/1955 39 days Heavy Casual  
Doncaster Works 30/08/1955 30/08/1955 1 day Weighing  
Doncaster Works 31/01/1956 09/03/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 27/06/1957 15/08/1957 50 days General
Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 27/11/1958 16/01/1959 51 days General
Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 15/03/1960 02/04/1960 19 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/09/1960 21/10/1960 42 days General
Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 08/03/1961 05/04/1961 29 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/02/1962 24/02/1962 24 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/06/1962 01/08/1962 59 days General
Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 17/08/1962 20/09/1962 35 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/03/1963 09/04/1963 29 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 07/05/1965 10/05/1965 4 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
16/02/1953 Good timekeeping Timekeeping on this section has been very commendable during recent bad weather months. On (16/2) A4 60013 on the 8 a.m. to Leeds passed Potters Bar on miles) in exactly 15 mins., going fast. On (19/2) the same train, engine and crew cut 5 minutes from the 39 minute schedule to Hitchin, start to stop. On (27/2) the Up Tees Tyne Pullman, behind A4 60026 arrived at Kings X at 1.53½, 14½ minutes early. Regular observers do not agree that the Cleethorpes train is the best timekeeper in this part of the world. The Up Yorkshire Pullman is quoted as being a better example; worked by a Copley Hill A1 this train is consistently as much as 5 or 6 minutes early, and hardly ever late. The Up Tees Tyne is probably a close runner up. SLS/195306
11/07/1953 Kings Cross failures A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. SLS/195310
04/01/1959 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. SLS/195902
19/03/1961 Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196105
26/02/1962 Doncaster Works (Weigh House) Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. SLS/196204
26/10/1963 Ex-Haymarket A4\'s During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. SLS/196311

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4485, name: KESTREL
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1850
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: LNER Corridor
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
08/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
29/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1937. Dep: 08/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
08/12/1937 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
22/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
12/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 02/01/1939.    
09/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
24/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1939. Dep: 25/08/1939.    
16/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 04/01/1940.    
12/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9127 (Diagram 107)
   
01/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 18/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
18/01/1942 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
04/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943.    
08/08/1943 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329    
09/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 12/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
12/09/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender    
08/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 04/02/1944.    
15/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1944. Dep: 12/01/1945.    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black
Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 587
   
18/04/1946 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 26    
05/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 05/03/1947.    
19/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Renamed
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
De-named KESTREL
   
27/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/11/1947 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
11/11/1947 Naming Renamed 'MILES BEEVOR'    
26/11/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
16/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949.    
11/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 23/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8948 (Diagram 107)
To 75% Cut-off
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
Renumbered to BR 60026
   
24/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 30/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
12/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 26/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107)
   
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
29/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5675 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
14/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Long guard irons removed
   
07/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953.    
01/06/1953 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329    
20/01/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5642    
16/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107)
   
04/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955.    
30/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 30/08/1955.    
31/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 09/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107)
   
27/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
27/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1958. Dep: 16/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107)
   
15/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960.    
10/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1960. Dep: 21/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
08/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1961. Dep: 05/04/1961.    
01/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962.    
04/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1962. Dep: 01/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107)
   
17/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1962. Dep: 20/09/1962.    
12/03/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1963. Dep: 09/04/1963.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
20/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
07/05/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1965. Dep: 10/05/1965.    
21/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60026 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev