|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1937 | 06/12/1937 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 41 days | General | Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1938 | 30/07/1938 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1938 | 11/02/1939 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1939 | 24/03/1939 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 9125 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1940 | 12/07/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1941 | 05/07/1941 | 23 days | Light Repair | Side skirting removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1943 | 30/01/1944 | 54 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1945 | 04/10/1945 | 56 days | General | Tender number 5327 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1947 | 01/10/1947 | 54 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. De-named SEA EAGLE Named WALTER K WHIGHAM |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1948 | 07/06/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60028 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1949 | 08/04/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1950 | 13/10/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29276 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1951 | 02/02/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1951 | 06/04/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1952 | 22/02/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1953 | 10/06/1953 | 38 days | WI | Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1954 | 13/08/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1956 | 23/02/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1959 | 10/06/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29324 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1959 | 28/01/1960 | 38 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1960 | 13/07/1960 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1961 | 18/04/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1962 | 07/03/1962 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
01/10/1949 | Inverurie Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61513/43, 62281, 4476/87, 5218/59, 65274, 5276, 65321, 68467, 69129, ex L.M.S. 4189/94, 15268, 16352, 17288, 57306. | SLS/194911 |
14/06/1952 | \"Capitals\" A.4\'s | During the first week of the Summer service the 'Capitals' was worked by No. 60017 from the Kings X end and No. 60027 from Edinburgh. This year it had been arranged that the Kings X men should work this train with their own engines; an idea about which the men, at least, were enthusiasts There seemed every chance that the scheme might work too as the regular engines have been maintained in fine condition of late, failures on the road with one being virtually unknown. However, the second week when 60007 should have been the engine, 60033 was sent instead as the former was giving some anxiety over the amount of oil it was using. 60033 also did its own turn the following week. 60028 an 60010 should have worked the fourth and fifth weeks respectively but 60017 did both weeks. No. 60017 is, in fact, spare at the moment as its two regular drivers (Messrs. Burgess and Smith) have taken over 60022, recently out of works and painted green. No. 60027 from the Edinburgh end has worked the train (and its equivalent Sunday working) daily without a break for the five weeks mentioned above, and so far shows no signs of ceasing to do so. All the drivers who have handled it say it is in superb condition. | SLS/195209 |
18/04/1953 | Hpeed Trials - further info | With further reference to last year's speed trials, our original correspondent remarks: 'The original notes did not mention high-speed trials, but that they were speed trials is still true (even if officially called timing trials). In this connection it should be remembered that the speed trials of the 1930's were usually given the official designation 'braking tests.' In the present instance, the intention was to sustain a speed of 85 m.p.h. over most of the run, no more and no less, apart from regular P.W. restrictions, and it was for this purpose that the speed limit over the line was raised to 90 m.p.h. generally, for these tests. Such speeds surely justify the description used, especially in view of the mediocrity of the great majority of post-war schedules. 'In addition it is doubtful whether A1's could 'easily better these times,' as was stated; there are no runs on record, known to the writer, which give any grounds for this statement, and no driver has claimed to have touched 95 m.p.h. four times between London and Leeds, as 60056 in fact did. Even though an A1 could do as well it does not follow that it could easily do better. 'As regards A4's and speedometers, 60028 was fitted for the trials at first, but being fairly new out of shops would have given a better than average performance and so 60003 with 50,000 miles to her credit, was fitted instead. In the last set of trials choice of loco was upset by the failure of 60022 on the first day, and the fact that on very few A4's do the speedometers work, and it is easier to fit a new and reliable one, rather than patch up those fitted.' | SLS/195306 |
29/06/1953 | Elizabethan Express | The first 'Elizabethan' from London was in charge of A4 60028 and Driver J. Howard, and both arrived on time and intact at Edinburgh despite the combined efforts of the reporters and television cameras. Up to quite a late hour it was hoped that 60022 would be able to do the trip but several failures of minor and major importance had made the prospect unlikely, then a final test a day or two beforehand still showed a tendency for one of the motion pins to run warm, and so 60028, fairly new ex works, was quickly made ready. So far, the first month has produced only one failure; a trailing bogie on 60008 ran hot (on Monday the 13th) on her first down run, and at Dunbar a D49 took over for the short run to Edinburgh. One of the Haymarket locos., No. 60009 was suspected of being a little warm on arrival at Kings Cross, during the second week, and 60028 was sent in its place the next morning (60017 had previously taken over the Kings X working leaving 60028 in reserve), 60009 returned on its right working later. This loco. had earlier worked the first Up train, a run spoilt by a piece of cotton waste blocking the water pick-up, causing a stop at Retford for a. 'drink.' Good work by Driver Smith thereafter reduced the late arrival to only five or six minutes. 60004 has performed well from the Edinburgh end (though reported a little weak at the front end), with some help from 60031. | SLS/195310 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
08/06/1961 | Duke of Kent\'s wedding | The Royal Train conveying H.M. the Queen and H.R.H. the Duke of Edinburgh from Kings Cross to York for the Duke of Kent's wedding on 8th June, was hauled by Class A4 60028 Walter K. Whigham in immaculate condition; 60014 Silver Link acting stand-by loco. The two additional trains carrying guests were worked by 60003 Andrew K. McCosh and 60015 Quicksilver. Pilots at Hitchin in the morning were Class A2/3 60514 Chamossaire and Class A3 60067 Ladas, but only the latter was present in the evening. E.E./V.F. Type '4' 1Co-Col diesels took the empty stock from York to Malton, where the guests entrained for the return journey behind the A4's. | SLS/196109 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/03/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4487, name: SEA EAGLE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1852 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1937. Dep: 06/12/1937. | ||
03/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
12/02/1938 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
21/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
09/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. | ||
21/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938. | ||
23/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1938. Dep: 11/02/1939. | ||
09/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 24/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9125 (Diagram 107) |
||
27/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
09/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1940. Dep: 12/07/1940. | ||
13/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed |
||
08/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1943. Dep: 30/01/1944. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
30/01/1944 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
07/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. | ||
10/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 04/10/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 5327 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
07/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 589 but not taken up | ||
20/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 28 | ||
09/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 01/10/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. De-named SEA EAGLE Named WALTER K WHIGHAM |
||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 07/06/1948. Work undertaken: Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60028 |
||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/06/1948 | Livery | Change of livery to Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining | ||
26/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1949. Dep: 08/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107) |
||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 13/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29276 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
19/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1951. Dep: 02/02/1951. | ||
27/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1951. Dep: 06/04/1951. | ||
30/06/1951 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5642 | ||
21/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 22/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
22/02/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
24/06/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5649 | ||
14/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. | ||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | |||
05/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 13/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 23/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) |
||
25/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
28/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29324 (Diagram 107) |
||
22/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1959. Dep: 28/01/1960. | ||
13/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1960. Dep: 13/07/1960. | ||
01/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1961. Dep: 18/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
06/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1962. Dep: 07/03/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60028 from Kings Cross (34A) | ||
18/01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |