Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 4488   29/06/1937
LNER (1946 1st) 590   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 9   12/01/1947
BR 60009   05/05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
17/04/1937 OSPREY (removed 20/06/1937)
28/06/1937 UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 19/04/1937
LNER Black Unlined 21/03/1942
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 14/08/1943
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 21/02/1947
BR Blue Black and White 04/08/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 02/10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 340
Works Number 1853
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 29/06/1937 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Wed 01/06/1966 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5325 17/04/1937 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5636 05/05/1948 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5591 14/05/1948 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5332 06/11/1963 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5484 17/07/1966 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes SPRINGBOK plaque fitted 12/4/54
Sold to J B Cameron 7/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) 29/06/1937
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
20/05/1962
   Withdrawn 01/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   01/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/06/1937 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8951)
29/07/1939 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
09/11/1940 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9129)
21/03/1942 Side skirting removed
13/01/1945 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8955)
09/02/1946 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9128)
05/05/1948 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8957)
04/08/1949 To 75% Cut-off
02/10/1952 Long guard irons removed
22/04/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29285)
17/06/1955 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29278)
05/04/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29319)
18/11/1958 Double Chimney fitted
18/11/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29310)
17/02/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27965)
19/07/1961 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27961)
06/11/1963 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29337)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 20/11/1937 11/12/1937 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/05/1938 18/06/1938 29 days General
Larger coal space provided
 
Doncaster Works 17/06/1939 29/07/1939 43 days General
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 23/03/1940 30/03/1940 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/09/1940 09/11/1940 50 days General
Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 31/01/1942 21/03/1942 50 days General
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Cowlairs Works 10/02/1943 12/02/1943 3 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/07/1943 14/08/1943 43 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 08/04/1944 22/04/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 25/11/1944 13/01/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 05/01/1946 09/02/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 9128 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 14/01/1947 21/02/1947 39 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 22/03/1948 05/05/1948 45 days General
Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5636 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60009
 
Doncaster Works 14/05/1948 14/05/1948 1 day Special
Tender change
Tender number 5591 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 24/06/1948 25/06/1948 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 19/11/1948 03/12/1948 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/06/1949 04/08/1949 50 days General
To 75% Cut-off
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 20/10/1950 23/11/1950 35 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/08/1952 02/10/1952 43 days General
Long guard irons removed
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 12/03/1954 22/04/1954 42 days General
Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 07/05/1955 17/06/1955 42 days General
Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 02/08/1956 04/09/1956 34 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 01/03/1957 05/04/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 08/10/1958 18/11/1958 42 days General
Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 12/01/1960 17/02/1960 37 days General
AWS and speed indicator fitted
Boiler number 27965 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 01/06/1961 19/07/1961 49 days General
Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 07/06/1962 16/08/1962 71 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/07/1963 06/11/1963 114 days General
Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Darlington Works 05/02/1964 18/04/1964 74 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1937 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325    
19/04/1937 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
29/06/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 4488
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1853
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
20/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937.    
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
   
17/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
23/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.    
21/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107)
   
31/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
10/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 12/02/1943.    
03/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
08/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.    
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 590 but not taken up    
05/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9128 (Diagram 107)
   
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9    
14/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1947. Dep: 21/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
22/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 05/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5636 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60009
   
14/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 14/05/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender change
Tender number 5591 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
24/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948.    
19/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948.    
16/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1949. Dep: 04/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
20/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950.    
21/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1952. Dep: 02/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Long guard irons removed
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
16/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953.    
12/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107)
   
07/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1955. Dep: 17/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107)
   
02/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1956. Dep: 04/09/1956.    
01/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1957. Dep: 05/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107)
   
08/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 18/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
12/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1960. Dep: 17/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
AWS and speed indicator fitted
Boiler number 27965 (Diagram 107)
   
01/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1961. Dep: 19/07/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107)
   
20/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
07/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1962. Dep: 16/08/1962.    
16/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1963. Dep: 06/11/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
05/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1963. Dep: 05/12/1963.    
05/02/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1964. Dep: 18/04/1964.    
01/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60009 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
17/07/1966 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5484    

prev prev