|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1937 | 06/12/1937 | 1 day | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1938 | 16/03/1938 | 42 days | General | Canadian Pacific Railway bell fitted 11/3/38 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1938 | 13/04/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 47 days | Heavy | Damaged in collision at Hatfield |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8908 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1943 | 29/04/1943 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1943 | 27/11/1943 | 30 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1946 | 10/05/1946 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 10 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1947 | 20/11/1947 | 37 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1948 | 27/10/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60010 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1949 | 08/04/1949 | 37 days | General | Crests removed Boiler number 9018 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1949 | 05/08/1949 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1950 | 29/09/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1953 | 23/01/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1953 | 27/08/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1955 | 17/02/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1956 | 01/06/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1957 | 27/12/1957 | 39 days | General | CPR bell taken off Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1960 | 25/02/1960 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 5326 (LNER Corridor) attached. Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1960 | 26/11/1960 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1961 | 04/03/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1962 | 31/03/1962 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1962 | 05/12/1962 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27970 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1962 | 28/12/1962 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1963 | 17/06/1963 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 06/05/1964 | 06/05/1964 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1965 | 12/05/1965 | 1 day | No repairs | 5/7/65 Marked in Darlington Records as "For sale to be scrapped" |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
14/06/1952 | \"Capitals\" A.4\'s | During the first week of the Summer service the 'Capitals' was worked by No. 60017 from the Kings X end and No. 60027 from Edinburgh. This year it had been arranged that the Kings X men should work this train with their own engines; an idea about which the men, at least, were enthusiasts There seemed every chance that the scheme might work too as the regular engines have been maintained in fine condition of late, failures on the road with one being virtually unknown. However, the second week when 60007 should have been the engine, 60033 was sent instead as the former was giving some anxiety over the amount of oil it was using. 60033 also did its own turn the following week. 60028 an 60010 should have worked the fourth and fifth weeks respectively but 60017 did both weeks. No. 60017 is, in fact, spare at the moment as its two regular drivers (Messrs. Burgess and Smith) have taken over 60022, recently out of works and painted green. No. 60027 from the Edinburgh end has worked the train (and its equivalent Sunday working) daily without a break for the five weeks mentioned above, and so far shows no signs of ceasing to do so. All the drivers who have handled it say it is in superb condition. | SLS/195209 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
11/07/1953 | A4 steaming problems rectified | After some long time, and many complaints, bad steaming by several London A4's has at last been cured. The trouble came to a head as a result of No. 60030, with a spare driver, sitting down on the main line just north of Barnet for a 'blow up.' The two regular drivers of this' loco. had long known how bad she was, but had learned to cope. However, extensive tests were carried out with No. 60033 and as a result, certain alterations were made to the blast pipes on the worst culprits, 60010/29/30 being three of those done. The effect on 60030 has been reported as phenomenal by one fireman, who claimed that with practically no firing, it was impossible to stop the loco. blowing off every time the regulator was shut. Quite a change from the run this loco. made in December, 1952, on the Yorkshire Pullman, when the pressure hardly ever went above the 180 lb. mark and for long periods had only 150 lb. on the clock, though, thanks to a piece of first-class enginemanship by its regular driver (E. Hailstone) no time was lost by the engine to Leeds. | SLS/195310 |
01/10/1953 | A4 trials | The extensive trials for steaming of A4's were carried out on No. 60010. A similar test was carried out with No. 60033 to get the comparison with the double chimney, as the four double-chimney A4's are unknown for steaming troubles. Actually one other engine was altered before the experiments were conducted on No. 60010 (I think it was No. 60014) and during the trial the blast-pipe (modified) out of No. 60014, was put into No. 60010 and actually remained in No. 60010 until she recently went to Doncaster. As a result of the trials all the King's Cross single blast-pipe A4's have their jumper tops fastened down immediately they come to King's Cross. Certain other modifications have been made to other A4 blast-pipes and two of them are now (October) being completely modified to Western ideals. To date, however, no definite trials have been conducted. | SLS/195401 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
11/09/1966 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop) | Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. | SLS/196610 |
11/12/1966 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. | SLS/196701 |
08/01/1967 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. | SLS/196702 |
19/02/1967 | Crewe Works (New paint shop) | Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. | SLS/196704 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/04/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5326 | ||
04/05/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4489, name: WOODCOCK Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1854 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
24/05/1937 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
15/06/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'DOMINION OF CANADA' | ||
06/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1937. Dep: 06/12/1937. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
03/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1938. Dep: 16/03/1938. Work undertaken: Canadian Pacific Railway bell fitted 11/3/38 |
||
12/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1938. Dep: 13/04/1938. | ||
18/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. | ||
31/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. Work undertaken: Damaged in collision at Hatfield |
||
18/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. | ||
09/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8908 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
29/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1943. Dep: 29/04/1943. | ||
29/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
27/11/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
07/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 591 but not taken up | ||
23/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 10/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 10 |
||
10/05/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
15/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
16/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60010 |
||
03/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 08/04/1949. Work undertaken: Crests removed Boiler number 9018 (Diagram 107) |
||
05/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1949. Dep: 05/08/1949. | ||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
03/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/04/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
08/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
16/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1953. Dep: 23/01/1953. | ||
29/06/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5647 | ||
09/07/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5639 | ||
20/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long guard irons removed |
||
10/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107) |
||
20/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1956. Dep: 01/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 27/12/1957. Work undertaken: CPR bell taken off Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
26/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) |
||
16/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 25/02/1960. | ||
29/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/08/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. Work undertaken: Tender number 5326 (LNER Corridor) attached. Speedometer fitted |
||
27/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960. | ||
16/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961. | ||
05/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. | ||
05/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962. | ||
04/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1962. Dep: 05/12/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27970 (Diagram 107) |
||
19/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1962. Dep: 28/12/1962. | ||
20/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1963. Dep: 17/06/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
06/05/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1964. Dep: 06/05/1964. | ||
12/05/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/05/1965. Dep: 12/05/1965. Work undertaken: 5/7/65 Marked in Darlington Records as "For sale to be scrapped" |
||
29/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60010 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |