Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 4489   04/05/1937
LNER (1946 1st) 591   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 10   10/05/1946
BR 60010   27/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/05/1937 WOODCOCK (removed 17/05/1937)
15/06/1937 DOMINION OF CANADA

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 24/05/1937
LNER Black Unlined 21/02/1942
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 27/11/1943
LNER Black Unlined 10/05/1946
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 20/11/1947
BR Blue Black and White 29/09/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 08/05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 340
Works Number 1854
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Sat 04/05/1937 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Sat 29/05/1965 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Service Life 28 yrs , 25 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5326 17/04/1937 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5328 06/12/1937 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5647 29/06/1953 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5639 09/07/1953 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5328 27/08/1953 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5326 15/10/1960 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes To traffic 4/5/37 for trials - returned to works 17/5/37 for re-painting and re-naming
Stored outside (not under cover) at Darlington Bank Top shed until sent to Crewe Works in August 1966 and restored externally. Shipped to Canada 10/4/

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 04/05/1937
35B Grantham 07/04/1957
34A Kings Cross 15/09/1957
34E New England 16/06/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
20/10/1963
   Withdrawn 29/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 29/06/1963
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 25/11/1963
WDN   w/e 29/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/05/1937 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8952)
21/02/1942 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8908)
21/02/1942 Side skirting removed
10/05/1946 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9126)
08/04/1949 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9018)
29/09/1950 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
29/09/1950 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29273)
27/08/1953 Long guard irons removed
27/08/1953 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29321)
17/02/1955 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29323)
01/06/1956 To 75% Cut-off
01/06/1956 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29312)
27/12/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29272)
27/12/1957 Double Chimney fitted
10/07/1959 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29307)
15/10/1960 Speedometer fitted
05/12/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27970)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 06/12/1937 06/12/1937 1 day Light Repair
Larger coal space provided
Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1938 16/03/1938 42 days General
Canadian Pacific Railway bell fitted 11/3/38
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1938 13/04/1938 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/10/1938 22/10/1938 5 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/01/1939 18/03/1939 47 days Heavy
Damaged in collision at Hatfield
 
Doncaster Works 18/03/1940 11/05/1940 55 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/01/1942 21/02/1942 44 days General
Boiler number 8908 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 29/03/1943 29/04/1943 32 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/10/1943 27/11/1943 30 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 07/12/1944 20/01/1945 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/03/1946 10/05/1946 49 days General
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 10
 
Doncaster Works 15/10/1947 20/11/1947 37 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 16/10/1948 27/10/1948 12 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 60010
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1949 08/04/1949 37 days General
Crests removed
Boiler number 9018 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 05/08/1949 05/08/1949 1 day Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 21/08/1950 29/09/1950 40 days General
Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 03/04/1952 08/05/1952 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 16/01/1953 23/01/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1953 27/08/1953 39 days General
Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 10/01/1955 17/02/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 20/04/1956 01/06/1956 43 days General
Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107)
To 75% Cut-off
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1957 27/12/1957 39 days General
CPR bell taken off
Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 26/05/1959 10/07/1959 46 days General
Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 16/02/1960 25/02/1960 10 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 29/08/1960 15/10/1960 48 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 5326 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 27/10/1960 26/11/1960 31 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 16/02/1961 04/03/1961 17 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/10/1961 27/10/1961 23 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/03/1962 31/03/1962 27 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/10/1962 05/12/1962 63 days General
Boiler number 27970 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 19/12/1962 28/12/1962 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 20/05/1963 17/06/1963 29 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 06/05/1964 06/05/1964 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/05/1965 12/05/1965 1 day No repairs
5/7/65 Marked in Darlington Records as "For sale to be scrapped"
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1937 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5326    
04/05/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 4489, name: WOODCOCK
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1854
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
24/05/1937 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
15/06/1937 Naming Renamed 'DOMINION OF CANADA'    
06/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1937. Dep: 06/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
03/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1938. Dep: 16/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Canadian Pacific Railway bell fitted 11/3/38
   
12/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1938. Dep: 13/04/1938.    
18/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.    
31/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Damaged in collision at Hatfield
   
18/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.    
09/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8908 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
29/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1943. Dep: 29/04/1943.    
29/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
07/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 591 but not taken up    
23/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 10/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 10
   
15/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
16/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60010
   
03/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 08/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Crests removed
Boiler number 9018 (Diagram 107)
   
05/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1949. Dep: 05/08/1949.    
21/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107)
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
03/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/04/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
16/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1953. Dep: 23/01/1953.    
29/06/1953 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5647    
09/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5639    
20/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Long guard irons removed
   
10/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107)
   
20/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1956. Dep: 01/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107)
To 75% Cut-off
   
07/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
19/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 27/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
CPR bell taken off
Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
26/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107)
   
16/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1960. Dep: 25/02/1960.    
29/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/08/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5326 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Speedometer fitted
   
27/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960.    
16/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961.    
05/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961.    
05/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962.    
04/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1962. Dep: 05/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27970 (Diagram 107)
   
19/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1962. Dep: 28/12/1962.    
20/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1963. Dep: 17/06/1963.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
20/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
06/05/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1964. Dep: 06/05/1964.    
12/05/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/05/1965. Dep: 12/05/1965.
Work undertaken:
5/7/65 Marked in Darlington Records as "For sale to be scrapped"
   
29/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60010 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev